blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0552358

EP0552358 - OLIGONUCLEOTIDES COMPLEMENTARY TO MYCOBACTERIAL NUCLEIC ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip26.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 11.02.2004  [2004/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vysis, Inc.
3100 Woodcreek Drive
Downers Grove, Illinois 60515-5424 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/49]For all designated states
VYSIS, INC.
3100 Woodcreek Drive
Downers Grove, Illinois 60515-5424 / US
Former [1993/30]For all designated states
AMOCO CORPORATION
Mail Code 1907, P.O. Box 87703
Chicago, IL 60680-0703 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LIU, Jing
53 Bedford Street
Waltham, MA 02154 / US
02 / NIETUPSKI, Raymond, Mark
6 Cherry Street
Millbury, MA 01527 / US
03 / SHAH, Jyotsna, Sudhir
14 Preserve Drive
Nashua, NH 03060 / US
[1993/30]
Representative(s)Holdcroft, James Gerald, et al
Graham Watt & Co LLP
St Botolph's House
7-9 St Botolph's Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 3AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/49]Holdcroft, James Gerald, Dr., et al
Graham Watt & Co., Riverhead
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB
Former [1996/19]Price, Vincent Andrew, et al
Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB
Former [1993/30]Goodwin, Mark, et al
Wilson, Gunn, M'Caw & Co., 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street
Manchester M2 7BD / GB
Application number, filing date92918298.813.08.1992
[1993/30]
WO1992US06821
Priority number, dateUS1991074428213.08.1991         Original published format: US 744282
[1993/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9304201
Date:04.03.1993
Language:EN
[1993/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0552358
Date:28.07.1993
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1993/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0552358
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.03.1993
ClassificationIPC:C12Q1/68, C07H21/04, C12P19/34
[1993/30]
CPC:
C12Q1/689 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   NL,   SE [1993/30]
TitleGerman:Oligonukleotiden komplementär zu mycobakterieller Nukleinsäure[1993/30]
English:OLIGONUCLEOTIDES COMPLEMENTARY TO MYCOBACTERIAL NUCLEIC ACIDS[1993/30]
French:OLIGONUCLEOTIDES COMPLEMENTAIRES D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES MYCOBACTERIENS[1993/30]
Entry into regional phase21.04.1993National basic fee paid 
21.04.1993Designation fee(s) paid 
21.04.1993Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.04.1993Examination requested  [1993/30]
10.11.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10)
18.12.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
10.09.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.11.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.05.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.12.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
09.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
08.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.10.1999Fee for grant paid
07.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Request for further processing for:17.12.1996Request for further processing filed
17.12.1996Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.01.1997Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
17.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 07
21.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.01.2000
BE12.01.2000
ES12.01.2000
GR12.01.2000
NL12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
DK12.04.2000
[2004/07]
Former [2003/45]AT12.01.2000
BE12.01.2000
ES12.01.2000
NL12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
DK12.04.2000
Former [2003/07]AT12.01.2000
BE12.01.2000
ES12.01.2000
NL12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
Former [2002/25]AT12.01.2000
BE12.01.2000
ES12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
Former [2002/23]AT12.01.2000
BE12.01.2000
SE12.01.2000
Former [2001/08]AT12.01.2000
BE12.01.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]WO8803957  (GEN PROBE INC [US]);
 [A]WO9008841  (GENE TRAK SYSTEMS [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.