EP0599975 - BATCH DEPOSITION OF POLYMERIC ION SENSOR MEMBRANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.12.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.1998 [1998/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN Technology Management Office Wolverine Towers, Room 2071, 3003 South State Street Ann Arbor, Michigan 48109-1280 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/10] | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN Technology Management Office Wolverine Towers, Room 2071, 3003 South State Street Ann Arbor, Michigan 48109-1280 / US | ||
Former [1994/32] | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN Technology Management Office, Wolverline Towers, Room 2071, 3003 South State Street Ann Arbor, Michigan 48109-1280 / US | ||
Former [1994/23] | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN Technology Management Office Wolverine Towers, Room 2071, 3003 South State Street Ann Arbor, Michigan 48109-1280 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Richard, B. 3910 Windmere Drive Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US | 02 /
CHA, Geun-Sig 9-78, Hongeu-2-dong Seodaemum-ku Seoul / KR | 03 /
GOLDBERG, Howard, David 1801 Willowtree Lane, Apt. B3 Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US | [1994/23] | Representative(s) | Denmark, James Bailey, Walsh & Co. 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD Yorkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/23] | Denmark, James Bailey, Walsh & Co. 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 92918299.6 | 20.08.1992 | [1994/23] | WO1992US07037 | Priority number, date | US19910748742 | 20.08.1991 Original published format: US 748742 | [1994/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9304359 | Date: | 04.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0599975 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.03.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/26, H01B1/04, G01N27/333 | [1994/41] | CPC: |
G01N27/3335 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/23] | G01N27/26, H01B1/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/23] | Title | German: | GRUPPENWEISE ANBRINGUNG VON POLYMERMEMBRANEN FÜR IONENSENSOREN | [1994/23] | English: | BATCH DEPOSITION OF POLYMERIC ION SENSOR MEMBRANES | [1994/23] | French: | DEPOT PAR LOTS DE MEMBRANES POLYMERES POUR CAPTEURS IONIQUES | [1994/23] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.1994 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.1994 | Search fee paid | 18.02.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 18.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/23] | 16.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/08] | 23.09.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1997 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US4784310 ; | [YP]US5063081 ; | [Y]US4505800 ; | [Y]US4889612 ; | [YP]US5102526 |