EP0614441 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CLEANING CONVEYOR BELTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.1996 [1996/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOLAN, Troy D. 140 Eleanor Drive Latrobe, PA 15650 / US | [1994/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/37] | Representative(s) | Bunke, Holger, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/37] | Bunke, Holger, Dr.rer.nat. Dipl.-Chem., et al Prinz & Partner Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92918721.9 | 17.08.1992 | [1994/37] | WO1992US06920 | Priority number, date | US19910753183 | 30.08.1991 Original published format: US 753183 | [1994/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9304959 | Date: | 18.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0614441 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.03.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65G45/16, B65G45/12 | [1995/02] | CPC: |
B65G45/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/37] | B65G45/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1994/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM REINIGEN VON FÖRDERBÄNDERN | [1994/37] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CLEANING CONVEYOR BELTS | [1994/37] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE DE BANDES TRANSPORTEUSES | [1994/37] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.1994 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.1994 | Search fee paid | 03.06.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 14.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/37] | 01.03.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/35] | 01.04.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1996/35] | Request for further processing for: | 22.06.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 22.06.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.07.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.05.1994 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   03.06.1994 | 03.05.1994 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   03.06.1994 | 03.05.1994 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   03.06.1994 | 03.05.1994 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   03.06.1994 | 03.05.1994 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   03.06.1994 | 03.05.1994 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   03.06.1994 | 03.05.1994 | LI   M01   Fee paid on   03.06.1994 | 03.05.1994 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   03.06.1994 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 24.06.1994 | M01   Fee paid on   14.07.1994 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1995 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4269301 (GIBBS ALFRED S); | [XY]US4344525 (BANCROFT JOHN, et al); | [A]US4533301 (FOSTER LESLIE W [US]); | [Y]US4694952 (MEIJER JOHAN B A [NL]); | [A]EP0338118 (NIHON TSUSHO KK [JP]) |