EP0559902 - PERMSELECTIVE POLYACRYLONITRILE COPOLYMER MEMBRANE AND PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.1997 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.03.1997 [1997/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. No. 1-Banchi, Teppo-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka-fu 590 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/37] | For all designated states DAICEL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. No. 1-Banchi, Teppo-cho Sakai-shi Osaka-fu 590 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEDA, Yasushi 889-11, Sinbashi Gotenba-shi Shizuoka 412 / JP | 02 /
MAGARA, Kengo 1367-21, Shinzaike Aboshi-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-12 / JP | 03 /
TSUGAYA, Hitoshi 1-14, Nankadai 4-chome Kawachinagano-shi Osaka 586 / JP | [1993/37] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/37] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92918907.4 | 03.09.1992 | [1993/37] | WO1992JP01127 | Priority number, date | JP19910222747 | 03.09.1991 Original published format: JP 22274791 | JP19920212634 | 10.08.1992 Original published format: JP 21263492 | [1993/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9304769 | Date: | 18.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0559902 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0559902 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.03.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B01D71/42 | [1993/37] | CPC: |
B01D67/0083 (EP,US);
B01D71/421 (EP,US);
B01D71/76 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1993/37] | Title | German: | PERMSELEKTIVE POLYACRYLNITRILCOPOLYMERMEMBRAN UND IHRE HERSTELLUNG | [1993/37] | English: | PERMSELECTIVE POLYACRYLONITRILE COPOLYMER MEMBRANE AND PRODUCTION THEREOF | [1993/37] | French: | MEMBRANE COPOLYMERE EN POLYACRYLONITRILE A PERMEABILITE SELECTIVE ET SA PRODUCTION | [1993/37] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.1993 | Translation filed | 29.04.1993 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.1993 | Search fee paid | 29.04.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/45] | 20.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3773848 (PERRY E, et al); | [A]FR2254355 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]); | [A]US4181694 (HASHINO YASUO [JP], et al); | [A]FR2443866 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [A]US5039420 (KLEIN ELIAS [US], et al) | International search | [A]JPS5827728 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [A]JPS6094104 (KYOWA GAS CHEM IND CO LTD); | [A]JPS6039402B |