Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2694050B | Global Dossier | 24.12.1997 | B2 | JPH06510345 | 17.11.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9111092 | 05.09.1991 | FR9200825 | 27.08.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0605473 | Global Dossier | 20.12.1995 | B1 | EP0605473 | 13.07.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9111092 | 05.09.1991 | FR9200825 | 27.08.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2116868 | 26.01.1999 | C | CA2116868 | 18.03.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9111092 | 05.09.1991 | FR9200825 | 27.08.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69207000T | 01.08.1996 | T2 | DE69207000D1 | 01.02.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR9111092 | 05.09.1991 | FR9200825 | 27.08.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5470169 | 28.11.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9111092 | 05.09.1991 | FR9200825 | 27.08.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9305235 | Global Dossier | 18.03.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9111092 | 05.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE131888T | 15.01.1996 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR9111092 | 05.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2083184T | 01.04.1996 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR9111092 | 05.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2681111 | 03.02.1995 | B1 | FR2681111 | 12.03.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9111092 | 05.09.1991 |