EP0562065 - DISPENSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.1996 [1996/45] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
KODAK LIMITED Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | For:CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | For:GB
KODAK LIMITED Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
For:CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FYSON, John Richard Tortworth, 8 Meynell Crescent Hackney, London E8 7AS / GB | 02 /
GLOVER, Edward, Charles, Timothy, Samuel 48 Hermitage Lane London NW2 2HG / GB | [1993/39] | Representative(s) | Mackett, Margaret, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | Phillips, Margaret Dawn, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 92919147.6 | 15.09.1992 | [1993/39] | WO1992EP02114 | Priority number, date | GB19910020349 | 24.09.1991 Original published format: GB 9120349 | [1993/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9306012 | Date: | 01.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0562065 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0562065 | Date: | 15.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65B69/00 | [1993/39] | CPC: |
B65B69/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/39] | Title | German: | ENTLADEVORRICHTUNG | [1993/39] | English: | DISPENSING APPARATUS | [1993/39] | French: | APPAREIL DISTRIBUTEUR | [1993/39] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.1993 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/39] | 23.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8200456 (BAXTER TRAVENOL LAB [US]); | [A]WO9107332 (KODAK LTD [GB], et al) |