EP0602144 - DNA SEQUENCES ENCODING GELONIN POLYPEPTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.10.1999 [1999/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION 402 North Division Street Carson City, Nevada 89703 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/25] | For all designated states RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION 402 North Division Street Carson City Nevada 89703 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSENBLUM, Michael, G. 8810 North Rylander Circle Houston, TX 77071 / US | 02 /
BEATTIE, Kenneth, L. 2 Hollymeade Drive The Woodlands, TX 77381 / US | [1994/25] | Representative(s) | Wilkinson, Stephen John, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/25] | Wilkinson, Stephen John, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 92919264.9 | 21.08.1992 | [1994/25] | WO1992US07066 | Priority number, date | US19910755949 | 06.09.1991 Original published format: US 755949 | [1994/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9305168 | Date: | 18.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0602144 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0602144 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.03.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/02, A61K39/44, C07H21/00, C12N1/00, C12N1/21, C12N5/10, C12N15/10, C12N15/63 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
C07K14/415 (EP,US);
A61K47/6825 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/25] | C12P21/02, A61K39/44, C07H21/00, C07K13/00, C12N1/00, C12N1/21, C12N5/10, C12N15/10, C12N15/63 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/25] | Title | German: | DNA-SEQUENZEN KODIEREND FÜR DAS POLYPEPTID GELONIN | [1994/25] | English: | DNA SEQUENCES ENCODING GELONIN POLYPEPTIDE | [1994/25] | French: | SEQUENCES D'ADN CODANT LE POLYPEPTIDE DE GELONINE | [1994/25] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.1994 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.1994 | Search fee paid | 14.02.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 14.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/25] | 18.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 24.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/43] | Request for further processing for: | 27.01.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 27.01.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.02.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8901028 (CETUS CORP [US]) [A] 7,10,19,20,32,33,41,45,46 * page 26, line 25 *; | [A]EP0340948 (MYCOGEN CORP [US]) [A] 1-7,10,19,20,32-36,41,44-46 * page 3, line 52 ** page 11 - page 12 *; | [PX]WO9203144 (RES DEV FOUNDATION [US]) [PX] 1-4,9,26-28 * the whole document * | [A] - MONTECUCCHI ET AL., "N-terminal sequence of some ribosome-inactivating proteins", INT. J. PEPTIDE PROTEIN RESEARCH, (1989), vol. 33, pages 263 - 267 [A] 1-7,26-28,38-40 * page 265 - page 266 * | International search | [X]US4888415 (LAMBERT JOHN M [US], et al) | [XY] - Journal of Biological Chemistry, Volume 255, No. 14, issued 25 July 1980, F. STIRPE et al., "Gelonin, a New Inhibitor of Protein Synthesis, Nontoxic to Intact Cells", pages 6947-6953, entire document. | [XY] - Nature, Volume 339, issued 01 June 1989, V.K. CHAUDHARY et al., "A recombinant immunotoxin consisting of two antibody variable domains fused to Pseudomonas exotoxin", pages 394-397, entire document. | [Y] - Gene, Volume 60, issued 1987, M.A. WOSNICK et al., "Rapid construction of large synthetic genes: total chemical synthesis of two different versions of the bovine prochymosin gene", pages 115-127, entire document. | [Y] - Nucleic Acids Research, Volume 15, No. 12, issued 1987, Z. HOSTOMSKY et al., "Solid-phase assembly of cow colostrum trypsin inhibitor gene", pages 4849-4856, entire document. | [Y] - J. SAMBROOK et al., "Molecular cloning, a laboratory manual", published 1989 by Cold Spring Harbor Press (N.Y.), pages XI-XXXVIII, entire document. | [Y] - S. BERGER et al. (eds.), "Guide to molecular cloning techniques", (Methods in Enzymology, Volume 152), published 1987 by Academic Press, Inc. (Calif.), pages V-X, entire document. | [Y] - Nucleic Acids Research, Volume 16, issued 1988, S-I. AOTA et al., "Codon usage tabulated from the Genbank Sequence Data", pages r315-r391, entire document. |