EP0602176 - OPTICS FOR A COLOUR-SORTING MACHINE AND A SORTING METHOD USING THESE OPTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.1997 [1997/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELEXSO SORTIERTECHNIK GmbH Hans-Dunckerstrasse 1 D-21035 Hamburg / DE | [1994/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUMANN, Rainer Schönefelder Chaussee 171 D-1185 Berlin / DE | 02 /
MORITZ, Thomas Geraer Ring 75 D-1134 Berlin / DE | 03 /
JUSTUS, Harald, C. Waldstr. 6 D-2057 Reinbek / DE | 04 /
MALLANT, Jos, Peter Oberer Landweg 93 D-2050 Hamburg 80 / DE | [1994/25] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/25] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 92919858.8 | 28.09.1992 | [1994/25] | WO1992EP02219 | Priority number, date | DE19914132472 | 30.09.1991 Original published format: DE 4132472 | [1994/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9306944 | Date: | 15.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0602176 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0602176 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B07C5/342 | [1994/25] | CPC: |
B07C5/342 (EP,US);
Y10S209/938 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [1994/25] | Title | German: | SORTIEROPTIK FÜR EINE FARBSORTIERMASCHINE UND VERFAHREN | [1994/25] | English: | OPTICS FOR A COLOUR-SORTING MACHINE AND A SORTING METHOD USING THESE OPTICS | [1994/25] | French: | OPTIQUE DE TRIAGE POUR UNE TRIEUSE PAR COULEUR ET PROCEDE | [1994/25] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.1994 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/27] | 24.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2165943 (SPANDREL ETS) |