EP0559865 - GLASS SIZE COMPOSITIONS AND GLASS FIBERS COATED THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.1999 [1999/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OWENS CORNING One Owens Corning Parkway Toledo Ohio 43659 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states OWENS CORNING One Owens Corning Parkway Toledo, Ohio 43659 / US | ||
Former [1997/09] | For all designated states OWENS CORNING 1 Owens Corning Parkway Toledo, Ohio 43659 / US | ||
Former [1996/28] | For all designated states OWENS CORNING Fiberglas Tower 26 Toledo, Ohio 43659 / US | ||
Former [1993/37] | For all designated states OWENS-CORNING FIBERGLAS CORPORATION Fiberglas Tower 26 Toledo, Ohio 43659 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRANNON, Robert, Clifford 613 Moull Street Newark, OH 43055 / US | [1993/37] | Representative(s) | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/37] | West, Alan Harry, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92919924.8 | 08.09.1992 | [1993/37] | WO1992US07576 | Priority number, date | US19910764574 | 19.09.1991 Original published format: US 764574 | [1993/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9306055 | Date: | 01.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0559865 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0559865 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C03C25/02 | [1993/37] | CPC: |
C03C25/26 (EP,US);
C03C25/36 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/2933 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2938 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2962 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2995 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1993/37] | Title | German: | SCHLICHTZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FUR GLAS UND DAMIT BESCHICHTETE GLASFASERN | [1993/37] | English: | GLASS SIZE COMPOSITIONS AND GLASS FIBERS COATED THEREWITH | [1993/37] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POUR COLLER LE VERRE ET FIBRES DE VERRE RECOUVERTES DESDITES COMPOSITIONS | [1993/37] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.1993 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/44] | 27.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.03.1997 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2208247 ; | [X]US4461804 (MOTSINGER DONALD L [US], et al); | [X]EP0219427 (SAINT GOBAIN ISOVER [FR]); | [X]EP0305249 (SAINT GOBAIN ISOVER [FR]); | [Y]US5026410 (POLLET JEAN-CLAUDE [US], et al); | [Y]US4933381 (HAGER THOMAS P [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 505 (C-775)5 November 1990 & JP,A,22 08 247 ( NIPPON GLASS FIBER CO. ) 17 August 1990, & JP2208247 A 19900817 |