EP0651681 - METHOD OF CASTING AMORPHOUS AND MICROCRYSTALLINE MICROWIRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.1999 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.1999 [1999/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECHNALUM RESEARCH, INC. One Kendall Square, Suite 2200, Building 200 Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [1995/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GORYNIN, Igor Vasilievich Nabereznaya House 1, Apt. 1207 Novosmolenskaya St. Petersburg, 19156 / RU | 02 /
FARMAKOVSKY, Boris Vladimirovich Grazdansky Prospect House 19/3 Apt. 100 St. Petersburg, 195220 / RU | 03 /
KHINSKY, Alexander Pavlovich Prospect Stachek House 74 Apt. 205 St. Petersburg, 193152 / RU | 04 /
KALOGINA, Karina Vasilievna Zanevsky Prospect House 10 Apt. 37 St. Petersburg, 195112 / RU | 05 /
RIVIERE, Alfredo V. Calle el Lindero Quinta Aurat Cerro Verde 20, Caracas / VE | 06 /
SZEKELY, Julian 141 Merriam Street Weston, MA 02193 / US | 07 /
SALUJA, Navtej Singh 26 Heath Road, No. 3 Arlington, MA 02174 / US | [1995/19] | Representative(s) | Greenwood, John David Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/19] | Greenwood, John David Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 92920257.0 | 01.09.1992 | [1995/19] | WO1992US07351 | Priority number, date | US19910766034 | 26.09.1991 Original published format: US 766034 | [1995/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9305904 | Date: | 01.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0651681 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.04.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/00, C03B37/026, B21C1/00 | [1995/19] | CPC: |
B22D11/005 (EP,US);
B21C1/00 (EP,US);
C03B37/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1995/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM GIESSEN VON AMORPHEN UND MIKRO-KRISTALLINEN MIKRODRÄHTEN | [1995/19] | English: | METHOD OF CASTING AMORPHOUS AND MICROCRYSTALLINE MICROWIRES | [1995/19] | French: | PROCEDE DE MOULAGE DE MICROFILS AMORPHES MICROCRISTALLINS | [1995/19] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.1994 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.1994 | Search fee paid | 10.04.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 10.04.1994 | Examination requested [1995/19] | 03.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.04.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/40] | 29.04.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1999/40] | Request for further processing for: | 26.09.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 26.09.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.10.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   29.10.1997 | 30.09.1998 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CH501447 (MENCHIKOV LEONID PETROVICH [RU], et al) [Y] 1-12* column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 34 *; | [Y]GB2063724 (FIAT RICERCHE) [Y] 1-12 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0050479 (UNITIKA LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0076618 (UNITIKA LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * | International search | [Y]CH501447 (MENCHIKOV LEONID PETROVICH [RU], et al) [Y] 1-30* column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 34 *; | [Y]GB2063724 (FIAT RICERCHE) [Y] 1-30 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0050479 (UNITIKA LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-30 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0076618 (UNITIKA LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-30 * abstract * |