EP0559917 - Method of manufacturing a ceramic mirror [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/37] | CERAMIC MIRROR AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | ||
[1997/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.1998 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1998 [1998/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIHON CEMENT CO., LTD. 6-1, 1-chome Ohtemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/52] | For all designated states NIHON CEMENT CO., LTD. 6-1, 1-chome Ohtemachi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
Former [1994/51] | For all designated states NIHON CEMENT CO., LTD. 6-1, 1-chome Ohtemachi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
Former [1993/37] | For all designated states NIHON CEMENT CO., LTD. 6-1, 1-chome Ohtemachi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states NIHON CERATEC CO., LTD. 5, Akedori 3-chome, Izumi-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KISHI, Yukio 302, Kokuo Funabashi Haitsu 4-6, Sakae-cho 1-chome Funabashi-shi Chiba-ken 273 / JP | [1993/37] | Representative(s) | Behrens, Dieter Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/37] | Behrens, Dieter, Dr.-Ing. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92920699.3 | 01.10.1992 | [1993/37] | WO1992JP01268 | Priority number, date | JP19910255101 | 02.10.1991 Original published format: JP 25510191 | [1993/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9307516 | Date: | 15.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0559917 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0559917 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.04.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/08 | [1993/37] | CPC: |
G02B5/08 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines keramischen Spiegels. | [1997/52] | English: | Method of manufacturing a ceramic mirror | [1997/52] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un miroir céramique | [1997/52] |
Former [1993/37] | Keramischer Spiegel und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung. | ||
Former [1993/37] | CERAMIC MIRROR AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | ||
Former [1993/37] | MIROIR CERAMIQUE ET PROCEDE POUR SA FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.1993 | Translation filed | 02.06.1993 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.1993 | Search fee paid | 02.06.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/37] | 13.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4492669 (GOULD GERALD [US]) [A] 3-5 * column 2, line 1 - line 22; figures 1-7 * | [XY] - K.KUROSAWA ET AL., "SUPER-POLISHED SILICON CARBIDE MIRROR FOR HIGH-POWER OPERATION OF EXCIMER LASERS IN A VACUUM ULTRAVIOLET SPECTRAL RANGE", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, NEW YORK US, (199002), vol. 61, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1063/1.1141485, pages 728 - 731, XP000103460 [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 1 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1141485 | [Y] - P.ASSUS ET AL., "LA REPLIQUE DE MIROIRS OPTIQUES", JOURNAL OF OPTICS, PARIS FR, (198910), vol. 20, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1088/0150-536X/20/5/004, pages 219 - 223, XP000083880 [Y] 1 * page 219; figures 3,5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0150-536X/20/5/004 | [A] - V.A.VILNROTTER, "OPTICAL RECEIVERS WITH ROUGH REFLECTORS", NTIS TECH NOTES, SPRINGFIELD, VA US, (198909), page 728, XP000100072 [A] 2 * the whole document * | [A] - J.M.BENNETT ET AL., "RELATION BETWEEN THE OPTICAL AND METALLURGICAL PROPERTIES OF POLISHED MOLYBDENUM MIRRORS", APPLIED OPTICS, NEW YORK US, (19801015), vol. 19, no. 20, pages 3562 - 3584 [A] 3-5 * page 3563 * | International search | [A]JPS5833099B ; | [A]JPS5833101B |