EP0609441 - Oxazolidone derivatives as monoamine oxidase inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/32] | OXAZOLIDONE DERIVATIVE | ||
[1998/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisai Co., Ltd. 6-10, Koishikawa 4-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-88 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | For all designated states Eisai Co., Ltd. 6-10, Koishikawa 4-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-88 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKASAKA, Kozo 47-5, Kamikashiwada 1-chome Ushiku-shi, Ibaraki 300-12 / JP | 02 /
KAJIWARA, Akiharu 34-21, Yatabe Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | 03 /
NAGATO, Satoshi Sejour Kasuga 201, 10-20, Kasuga 4-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | 04 /
IIMURA, Youichi 5-87, Ninomiya 4-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | 05 /
YOSHIDA, Ichirou Mezon Gakuen 204, 23-5, Amakubo 2-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | 06 /
SASAKI, Atsushi Eisai Shizanryo 307, 19-13, Kasuga 4-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | 07 /
MIZUNO, Masanori 1-17, Doaikita 1-chome, Hasakimachi Kashima-gun, Ibaraki 314-03 / JP | 08 /
KUBOTA, Atsuhiko 1130-9, Ohaza Nagakuni Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300 / JP | 09 /
KAGAYA, Takaki Sejour Kasuga 205, 10-20, Kasuga 4-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | 10 /
KOMATSU, Mariko 5-62, Ninomiya 4-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | [1994/32] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92920700.9 | 30.09.1992 | [1994/32] | WO1992JP01257 | Priority number, date | JP19910275526 | 23.10.1991 Original published format: JP 27552691 | JP19920236642 | 04.09.1992 Original published format: JP 23664292 | [1994/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9308179 | Date: | 29.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0609441 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0609441 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.04.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07D263/56, C07D417/14, A61K31/42, A61K31/425, C07D417/04 | [1994/32] | CPC: |
C07D263/57 (EP,US);
C07D263/56 (KR);
A61K31/42 (KR);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/26 (EP);
C07D417/04 (EP,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/32] | Title | German: | Oxazolidone Derivative als Monoamine-Oxidaseinhibitoren | [1998/49] | English: | Oxazolidone derivatives as monoamine oxidase inhibitors | [1998/49] | French: | Derive d'oxazolidone comme inhibiteurs de monoamine oxidase | [1998/49] |
Former [1994/32] | OXAZOLIDONE DERIVAT | ||
Former [1994/32] | OXAZOLIDONE DERIVATIVE | ||
Former [1994/32] | DERIVE D'OXAZOLIDONE | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.1994 | Translation filed | 03.03.1994 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.1994 | Search fee paid | 03.03.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 03.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/32] | 15.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.07.1999 | BE | 21.07.1999 | CH | 21.07.1999 | ES | 21.07.1999 | GR | 21.07.1999 | IT | 21.07.1999 | LI | 21.07.1999 | NL | 21.07.1999 | SE | 21.07.1999 | IE | 30.09.1999 | LU | 30.09.1999 | DK | 21.10.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 21.07.1999 | |
BE | 21.07.1999 | ||
CH | 21.07.1999 | ||
ES | 21.07.1999 | ||
GR | 21.07.1999 | ||
LI | 21.07.1999 | ||
NL | 21.07.1999 | ||
SE | 21.07.1999 | ||
IE | 30.09.1999 | ||
LU | 30.09.1999 | ||
DK | 21.10.1999 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 21.07.1999 | |
BE | 21.07.1999 | ||
CH | 21.07.1999 | ||
ES | 21.07.1999 | ||
GR | 21.07.1999 | ||
LI | 21.07.1999 | ||
NL | 21.07.1999 | ||
SE | 21.07.1999 | ||
IE | 30.09.1999 | ||
DK | 21.10.1999 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 21.07.1999 | |
BE | 21.07.1999 | ||
CH | 21.07.1999 | ||
ES | 21.07.1999 | ||
GR | 21.07.1999 | ||
LI | 21.07.1999 | ||
NL | 21.07.1999 | ||
SE | 21.07.1999 | ||
IE | 30.09.1999 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 21.07.1999 | |
BE | 21.07.1999 | ||
CH | 21.07.1999 | ||
ES | 21.07.1999 | ||
GR | 21.07.1999 | ||
LI | 21.07.1999 | ||
SE | 21.07.1999 | ||
IE | 30.09.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 21.07.1999 | |
BE | 21.07.1999 | ||
CH | 21.07.1999 | ||
GR | 21.07.1999 | ||
LI | 21.07.1999 | ||
SE | 21.07.1999 | ||
IE | 30.09.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 21.07.1999 | |
BE | 21.07.1999 | ||
CH | 21.07.1999 | ||
GR | 21.07.1999 | ||
LI | 21.07.1999 | ||
IE | 30.09.1999 | ||
Former [2001/12] | AT | 21.07.1999 | |
BE | 21.07.1999 | ||
CH | 21.07.1999 | ||
LI | 21.07.1999 | ||
IE | 30.09.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 21.07.1999 | |
BE | 21.07.1999 | ||
CH | 21.07.1999 | ||
LI | 21.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 21.07.1999 | |
BE | 21.07.1999 | ||
CH | 26.10.1999 | ||
LI | 26.10.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | AT | 21.07.1999 | |
BE | 21.07.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPS5753473 (DELALANDE SA) |