EP0607222 - DENDRIMERIC POLYCHELANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NYCOMED SALUTAR, INC. 428 Oakmead Parkway Sunnyvale California 94086 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | For all designated states NYCOMED SALUTAR, INC. 428 Oakmead Parkway Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATSON, Alan D. 262A Rincon Avenue Campbell, CA 95008 / US | [1994/30] | Representative(s) | Cockbain, Julian, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | Cockbain, Julian, Dr., et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92920822.1 | 06.10.1992 | [1994/30] | WO1992EP02308 | Priority number, date | US19910772349 | 07.10.1991 Original published format: US 772349 | [1994/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9306868 | Date: | 15.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0607222 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0607222 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/00, A61K47/48 | [1994/30] | CPC: |
B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
A61K47/595 (EP,US);
A61K49/189 (EP,US);
A61P39/02 (EP);
C08G83/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/30] | Title | German: | DENDRIMERE POLYCHELATE | [1994/30] | English: | DENDRIMERIC POLYCHELANTS | [1994/30] | French: | POLYCHELATEURS DENDRIMERES | [1994/30] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.1994 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/30] | 12.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.12.1998 | BE | 23.12.1998 | CH | 23.12.1998 | ES | 23.12.1998 | GR | 23.12.1998 | LI | 23.12.1998 | NL | 23.12.1998 | DK | 23.03.1999 | SE | 23.03.1999 | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 23.12.1998 | |
BE | 23.12.1998 | ||
CH | 23.12.1998 | ||
ES | 23.12.1998 | ||
GR | 23.12.1998 | ||
LI | 23.12.1998 | ||
NL | 23.12.1998 | ||
SE | 23.03.1999 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 23.12.1998 | |
BE | 23.12.1998 | ||
CH | 23.12.1998 | ||
ES | 23.12.1998 | ||
GR | 23.12.1998 | ||
LI | 23.12.1998 | ||
SE | 23.03.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 23.12.1998 | |
BE | 23.12.1998 | ||
CH | 23.12.1998 | ||
GR | 23.12.1998 | ||
LI | 23.12.1998 | ||
SE | 23.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 23.12.1998 | |
BE | 23.12.1998 | ||
CH | 23.12.1998 | ||
LI | 23.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 23.12.1998 | |
BE | 23.12.1998 | ||
CH | 29.03.1999 | ||
LI | 29.03.1999 | ||
Former [1999/34] | AT | 23.12.1998 | |
BE | 23.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | BE | 23.12.1998 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0233619 (NIHON MEDIPHYSICS CO LTD [JP]); | [X]WO8801180 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [X]WO8801179 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [X]WO8801178 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [XP]WO9012050 (COCKBAIN JULIAN R M [GB], et al); | [X]WO9014881 (AKZO NV [NL], et al); | [X]EP0430863 (SCHERING AG [DE]); | [E]EP0512661 (SCHERING AG [DE]) |