Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9216956 | Global Dossier | 01.10.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9101841 | 20.03.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3171398B | Global Dossier | 28.05.2001 | B2 | JPH06505829 | 30.06.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US9101841 | 20.03.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0576634 | Global Dossier | 09.10.1996 | B1 | EP0576634 | 05.01.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9101841 | 20.03.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69122628T | 27.03.1997 | T2 | DE69122628D1 | 14.11.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9101841 | 20.03.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5034857 | 23.07.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US41792989 | 06.10.1989 | US9101841 | 20.03.1991 |