EP0576634 - POROUS ELECTROLYTIC ANODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.1997 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.1997 [1997/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPOSITE MATERIALS TECHNOLOGY, Inc. 830 Boston Turnpike Road Shrewsbury, MA 01545 / US | [1994/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WONG, James 25 Cameron Road Wayland, MA 01778 / US | [1994/01] | Representative(s) | Dubois-Chabert, Guy BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lanceraux 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/01] | Dubois-Chabert, Guy Société de Protection des Inventions 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 92920987.2 | 20.03.1991 | [1994/01] | WO1991US01841 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9216956 | Date: | 01.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0576634 | Date: | 05.01.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0576634 | Date: | 09.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01G9/042 | [1996/41] | CPC: |
H01G9/052 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49014 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/01] | H01G9/05 | Designated contracting states | DE [1994/01] | Title | German: | PORÖSE ELECTROLYTISCHE ANODE | [1994/01] | English: | POROUS ELECTROLYTIC ANODE | [1994/01] | French: | ANODE ELECTROLYTIQUE POREUSE | [1994/01] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.1993 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 30.08.1993 | Examination requested [1994/01] | 27.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.04.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.11.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1539696 (BRUNSWICK CORP); | [A]US3698863 (ROBERTS JOHN A, et al); | [Y]US3742369 (DOUGLASS R); | [Y]US3850697 (BROWN P, et al) |