EP0643672 - METHOD OF CONTROLLING WASTEWATER PURIFICATION PLANTS USING QUALITY EVALUATION OF MEASURING DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states I. KRÜGER SYSTEMS A/S 363, Gladsaxevej DK-2860 Soborg / DK | [1995/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIELSEN, Marinus, Kristian Kollemosevej 47 DK-2830 Virum / DK | [1995/12] | Representative(s) | Kyed, Iver, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | Kyed, Iver, et al c/o LEHMANN & REE A/S Grundtvigsvej 37 DK-1864 Frederiksberg C / DK | Application number, filing date | 92921436.9 | 01.10.1992 | [1995/12] | WO1992DK00291 | Priority number, date | DK19910001677 | 01.10.1991 Original published format: DK 167791 | [1995/12] | Filing language | DA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9307089 | Date: | 15.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0643672 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0643672 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 15.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/00, C02F3/00 | [1995/12] | CPC: |
G05D21/02 (EP,US);
C02F3/006 (EP,US);
G05B21/02 (EP,US);
C02F2209/10 (EP,US);
C02F2209/15 (EP,US);
C02F2209/18 (EP,US);
C02F2209/22 (EP,US);
C02F2209/225 (EP,US);
C02F2209/40 (EP,US);
C02F2209/44 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1995/12] | Title | German: | METHODE ZUM REGELN VON ABWASSERREINIGUNGSANLAGEN UNTER ANWENDUNG VON QUALITÄTSAUSWERTUNG VON MESSWERTEN | [1996/36] | English: | METHOD OF CONTROLLING WASTEWATER PURIFICATION PLANTS USING QUALITY EVALUATION OF MEASURING DATA | [1995/12] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONTROLE D'INSTALLATIONS D'EPURATION DES EAUX D'EGOUT PAR L'EVALUATION DE LA QUALITE DES DONNEES DE MESURE | [1995/12] |
Former [1995/12] | METHODE ZUM REGELN VON ABWASSERREINIGUNGSANLAGEN UNTER ANWENDUNG VON QUALITÄTSAUSWERTUNG VON MESSARTEN | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.1994 | Translation filed | 14.04.1994 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.04.1994 | Examination requested [1995/12] | 24.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.09.1996 | BE | 04.09.1996 | CH | 04.09.1996 | IT | 04.09.1996 | LI | 04.09.1996 | NL | 04.09.1996 | LU | 31.10.1996 | IE | 04.11.1996 | GB | 04.12.1996 | MC | 30.04.1997 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/18] | AT | 04.09.1996 | |
BE | 04.09.1996 | ||
CH | 04.09.1996 | ||
IT | 04.09.1996 | ||
LI | 04.09.1996 | ||
NL | 04.09.1996 | ||
LU | 31.10.1996 | ||
IE | 04.11.1996 | ||
GB | 04.12.1996 | ||
MC | 30.04.1997 | ||
Former [2003/17] | AT | 04.09.1996 | |
BE | 04.09.1996 | ||
CH | 04.09.1996 | ||
IT | 04.09.1996 | ||
LI | 04.09.1996 | ||
NL | 04.09.1996 | ||
LU | 31.10.1996 | ||
IE | 04.11.1996 | ||
GB | 04.12.1996 | ||
MC | 02.05.1997 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 04.09.1996 | |
BE | 04.09.1996 | ||
CH | 04.09.1996 | ||
IT | 04.09.1996 | ||
LI | 04.09.1996 | ||
NL | 04.09.1996 | ||
LU | 31.10.1996 | ||
IE | 04.11.1996 | ||
GB | 04.12.1996 | ||
MC | 30.04.1997 | ||
Former [2001/05] | AT | 04.09.1996 | |
BE | 04.09.1996 | ||
CH | 04.09.1996 | ||
IT | 04.09.1996 | ||
LI | 04.09.1996 | ||
LU | 31.10.1996 | ||
IE | 04.11.1996 | ||
GB | 04.12.1996 | ||
MC | 30.04.1997 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 04.09.1996 | |
BE | 04.09.1996 | ||
CH | 04.09.1996 | ||
IT | 04.09.1996 | ||
LI | 04.09.1996 | ||
LU | 31.10.1996 | ||
GB | 04.12.1996 | ||
MC | 30.04.1997 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 04.09.1996 | |
BE | 04.09.1996 | ||
IT | 04.09.1996 | ||
LU | 31.10.1996 | ||
GB | 04.12.1996 | ||
CH | 10.12.1996 | ||
LI | 10.12.1996 | ||
MC | 30.04.1997 | ||
Former [2000/07] | AT | 04.09.1996 | |
BE | 04.09.1996 | ||
IT | 04.09.1996 | ||
LU | 31.10.1996 | ||
GB | 04.12.1996 | ||
MC | 30.04.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 04.09.1996 | |
BE | 04.09.1996 | ||
IT | 04.09.1996 | ||
GB | 04.12.1996 | ||
MC | 30.04.1997 | ||
Former [1998/05] | AT | 04.09.1996 | |
BE | 04.09.1996 | ||
GB | 04.12.1996 | ||
MC | 30.04.1997 | ||
Former [1997/50] | AT | 04.09.1996 | |
BE | 04.09.1996 | ||
MC | 30.04.1997 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 04.09.1996 | |
BE | 04.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/25] | BE | 04.09.1996 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0446036 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) |