Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0608423
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
24.04.1998 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.06.1998 [1998/24] |
02.05.1997 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.06.1997 [1997/25] |
08.03.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.12.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.10.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.08.1996 |
First examination report |
|
15.08.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
22.06.1995 |
Change - applicant |
published on 09.08.1995 [1995/32] |
06.10.1994 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 23.11.1994 [1994/47] |
17.06.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] |
17.06.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] |