EP0569564 - BIPHENYLYLQUINUCLIDINES, USEFUL AS SQUALENE SYNTHETASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeneca Limited 15 Stanhope Gate London W1Y 6LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/28] | For all designated states ZENECA LIMITED 15 Stanhope Gate London W1Y 6LN / GB | ||
Former [1995/07] | For all designated states Zeneca Limited 15 Stanhope Gate London W1Y 6LN / GB | ||
Former [1993/46] | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, George Robert 11 Church Road Wilmslow, Cheshire SK9 6HH / GB | 02 /
MALLION, Keith Blakeney 4 Aylesby Close Knutsford, Cheshire WA16 8AE / GB | 03 /
HARRISON, Peter, John / Deceased / US | [1993/46] | Representative(s) | Bill, Kevin, et al ZENECA Pharmaceuticals Intellectual Property Department Mereside Alderley Park Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/07] | Bill, Kevin, et al ZENECA Pharmaceuticals Intellectual Property Department Mereside Alderley Park GB-Macclesfield, Cheshire SK10 4TG / GB | ||
Former [1993/46] | Bill, Kevin ICI Group Legal Dept: Patents P.O. Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Hertfordshire AL7 1HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 92921983.0 | 27.10.1992 | [1993/46] | WO1992GB01968 | Priority number, date | GB19910022988 | 30.10.1991 Original published format: GB 9122988 | [1993/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9309115 | Date: | 13.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0569564 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0569564 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07D453/02, A61K31/435 | [1993/46] | CPC: |
C07D453/02 (EP,US);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1993/46] | Title | German: | DIPHENYLYLCHINUCLIDINE ALS SQUALEN-SYNTHETASE-INHIBITOREN | [1993/46] | English: | BIPHENYLYLQUINUCLIDINES, USEFUL AS SQUALENE SYNTHETASE INHIBITORS | [1993/46] | French: | BIPHENYLYLQUINUCLIDINES UTILISEES COMME INHIBITEURS DE SQUALENE SYNTHETASE | [1993/46] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.1993 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/46] | 26.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.12.1997 | BE | 29.12.1997 | DK | 29.12.1997 | ES | 29.12.1997 | GR | 29.12.1997 | NL | 29.12.1997 | SE | 29.03.1998 | [2015/21] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 29.12.1997 | |
BE | 29.12.1997 | ||
ES | 29.12.1997 | ||
GR | 29.12.1997 | ||
NL | 29.12.1997 | ||
SE | 29.03.1998 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 29.12.1997 | |
BE | 29.12.1997 | ||
ES | 29.12.1997 | ||
GR | 29.12.1997 | ||
SE | 29.03.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 29.12.1997 | |
BE | 29.12.1997 | ||
GR | 29.12.1997 | ||
SE | 29.03.1998 | ||
Former [1998/46] | AT | 29.12.1997 | |
BE | 29.12.1997 | ||
SE | 29.03.1998 | ||
Former [1998/40] | AT | 29.12.1997 | |
SE | 29.03.1998 | ||
Former [1998/35] | SE | 29.03.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A] - JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES vol. 80, no. 8, August 1991, pages 785 - 789 G.H. STERLING ET AL. 'Quaternary and tertiary quinuclidine derivatives as inhibitors of choline uptake' cited in the application |