EP0607332 - METHOD OF PROPHYLAXIS OR TREATMENT OF ANTIGEN PRESENTING CELL DRIVEN SKIN CONDITIONS USING INHIBITORS OF THE CD2/LFA-3 INTERACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.1998 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.12.1998 [1998/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOGEN, INC. 14 Cambridge Center Cambridge Massachusetts 02142 / US | For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN Wolverine Tower, Room 2071, 3003 South State Street Ann Arbor, Michigan 48109-1280 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/06] | For all designated states BIOGEN, INC. 14 Cambridge Center Cambridge Massachusetts 02142 / US | ||
For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN Wolverine Tower, Room 2071, 3003 South State Street Ann Arbor, Michigan 48109-1280 / US | |||
Former [1994/30] | For all designated states BIOGEN, INC. 14 Cambridge Center Cambridge Massachusetts 02142 / US | ||
For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN 475 East Jefferson, Room 2354 Ann Arbor, Michigan 48109-1248 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALLNER, Barbara, P. 7 Centre Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
COOPER, Kevin, D. 3815 Windemere Drive Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US | [1994/30] | Representative(s) | Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | ||
Former [1994/30] | Pett, Christopher Phineas Frank B. Dehn & Co. European Patent Attorneys Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92922246.1 | 06.10.1992 | [1994/30] | WO1992US08755 | Priority number, date | US19910770969 | 07.10.1991 Original published format: US 770969 | US19920862022 | 02.04.1992 Original published format: US 862022 | [1994/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9306866 | Date: | 15.04.1993 | [1993/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0607332 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0607332 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61K39/02 | [1997/51] | CPC: |
C07K16/2824 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P17/16 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
C07K14/70507 (EP);
C07K14/70528 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1994/30] | A61K39/395, A61K39/02, // (A61K39/395, 37:02) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/30] | Title | German: | VORBEUGUNGSMETHODE ODER BEHANDLUNG VON, DURCH ANTIGEN-PRÄSENTIERENDE ZELLEN HERVORGERUFENE, HAUTKRANKHEITEN MITTELS INHIBITOREN DER CD2/LFA-3 WECHSELWIRKUNG | [1994/30] | English: | METHOD OF PROPHYLAXIS OR TREATMENT OF ANTIGEN PRESENTING CELL DRIVEN SKIN CONDITIONS USING INHIBITORS OF THE CD2/LFA-3 INTERACTION | [1994/30] | French: | PROCEDE PROPHYLACTIQUE OU THERAPEUTIQUE DE MALADIES DE LA PEAU CAUSEES PAR DES CELLULES PRESENTANT DES ANTIGENES AU MOYEN D'INHIBITEURS DE L'INTERACTION ENTRE CD2 ET LFA-3 | [1994/30] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.1994 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/30] | 21.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - TRANSPLANTATION vol. 51, no. 1, January 1991, BALTIMORE MD, US pages 219 - 225 J. BROMBERG ET AL. 'Anti-CD2 monoclonal antibodies alter cell-mediated immunity in vivo.' | [A] - ARTHRITIS AND RHEUMATISM vol. 34, no. 9, September 1991, NEW YORK, US pages 1164 - 1172 D. ABRAHAM ET AL. 'Expression and function of surface antigens on scleroderma fibroblasts.' | [A] - EXPERIMENTAL CELL RESEARCH vol. 190, no. 1, September 1990, NEW YORK, US pages 118 - 126 D. ABRAHAM ET AL. 'Interactions between lymphocytes and dermal fibroblasts: An in vitro model of cutaneous lymphocyte trafficking.' | [XP] - CLINICAL RESEARCH vol. 40, no. 2, 1992, THOROFARE NJ, US page 500A A. GONZALES-RAMOS ET AL. 'APC-targeted immunointervention in psoriasis: Blockade of LFA3-CD2 and ICAM1-LFA1 ligand pairing blocks autoreactivity to lesional epidermis.' |