Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0606399 | Global Dossier | 20.07.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9203565 | 19.03.1992 | FR9200900 | 28.09.1992 | FR9112333 | 02.10.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2682016 | 12.08.1994 | B1 | FR2682016 | 09.04.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9112333 | 02.10.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2688663 | 27.05.1994 | B3 | FR2688663 | 24.09.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9203565 | 19.03.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9306760 | Global Dossier | 15.04.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9203565 | 19.03.1992 | FR9112333 | 02.10.1991 |