EP0611300 - WORKABLE SHAVING CREAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1996 | Change - applicant | published on 28.08.1996 [1996/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [1996/35] |
Former [1994/34] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BREITZKE, Willi Am Falder 22 D-4000 Düsseldorf 13 / DE | 02 /
BÖTTCHER, Axel Albertus-Magnus-Strasse 30 D-4040 Neuss 21 / DE | [1994/34] | Application number, filing date | 92922738.7 | 30.10.1992 | [1994/34] | WO1992EP02501 | Priority number, date | DE19914136727 | 08.11.1991 Original published format: DE 4136727 | [1994/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9308789 | Date: | 13.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0611300 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/15 | [1994/34] | CPC: |
A61K8/361 (EP);
A61K8/345 (EP);
A61Q9/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/34] | Title | German: | VERFORMBARE RASIERCREMES | [1994/34] | English: | WORKABLE SHAVING CREAMS | [1994/34] | French: | CREMES A RASER DEFORMABLES | [1994/34] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.1994 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/34] | 10.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3574118 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 111, no. 12 Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 102541e, H. NIWASE 'SKIN CLEANSING FOAM COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING AMPHOTERIC PHOSPHATE SURFACTANTS AND HIGUER FATTY ACIDS (SALTS)' | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 96, no. 14 Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 109969f, 'EMOLLIENT SKIN LOTIONS CONTAINING BRANCHED FATTY ACID SOAPS' |