EP0611480 - RESONANT TAG OF SOFT MAGNETIC ALLOY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/34] | HEAT TREATMENT PROCESS AND SOFT MAGNETIC ALLOYS PRODUCED THEREBY | ||
[1996/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.1997 [1997/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07962-2245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/28] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | ||
Former [1994/46] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | ||
Former [1994/34] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIS, Ronald, Joseph 2 Wallace Street East Hanover, NJ 07936 / US | [1994/34] | Representative(s) | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/34] | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 92923224.7 | 28.10.1992 | [1994/34] | WO1992US09169 | Priority number, date | US19910787495 | 04.11.1991 Original published format: US 787495 | [1994/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9309549 | Date: | 13.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0611480 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0611480 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01F1/153, G08B13/24 | [1994/34] | CPC: |
G08B13/2408 (EP,US);
G01V15/00 (EP,US);
G08B13/2442 (EP,US);
H01F1/15308 (EP,US);
H01F1/15333 (EP,US);
H01F1/15341 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/34] | Title | German: | RESONANZSTREIFEN AUS WEICHMAGNETISCHER LEGIERUNG | [1996/20] | English: | RESONANT TAG OF SOFT MAGNETIC ALLOY | [1996/20] | French: | RUBAN RESONANT D'ALLIAGE MAGNETIQUE DOUX | [1996/20] |
Former [1994/34] | WAERMEBEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN UND WEICHMAGNETISCHE LEGIERUNGEN DARAUS | ||
Former [1994/34] | HEAT TREATMENT PROCESS AND SOFT MAGNETIC ALLOYS PRODUCED THEREBY | ||
Former [1994/34] | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE ET ALLIAGES MAGNETIQUES DOUX AINSI PRODUITS | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.1994 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/34] | 19.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2233345 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]) | [Y] - JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS. vol. 57, no. 8, 15 April 1985, NEW YORK US pages 3572 - 3574 K.INOMATA ET AL | [Y] - JOURNAL OF MAGNETISM AND MAGNETIC MATERIALS vol. 62, 1986, AMSTERDAM NL pages 143 - 151 G.HERZER ET AL cited in the application | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 187 (E-516)(2634) 16 June 1987 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 239 (E-630)(3086) 7 July 1988 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 238 (C-841)19 June 1991 |