EP0570551 - VENTING DEVICE FOR A FUEL TANK OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.1996 [1996/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/47] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENZ, Helmut Lindenspuerstr. 18 D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | 02 /
NEU, Hans Ulmenweg 31 D-7143 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | 03 /
RIEHL, Guenther Hauptstr. 6 D-7582 Buehlertal / DE | 04 /
BLUMENSTOCK, Andreas Jaegerhofallee 79 D-7140 Ludwigsburg / DE | 05 /
FRANK, Rainer An der Steige 36 D-7123 Sachsenheim / DE | [1993/47] | Application number, filing date | 92923254.4 | 13.11.1992 | [1993/47] | WO1992DE00944 | Priority number, date | DE19914140256 | 06.12.1991 Original published format: DE 4140256 | [1993/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9310991 | Date: | 10.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0570551 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0570551 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B60K15/035, F02M25/08 | [1993/47] | CPC: |
F02M25/0854 (EP,US);
B60K15/03504 (EP,US);
B60K15/03519 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/47] | Title | German: | ENTLÜFTUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN BRENNSTOFFTANK EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [1993/47] | English: | VENTING DEVICE FOR A FUEL TANK OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [1993/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MISE A L'AIR POUR UN RESERVOIR DE CARBURANT D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [1993/47] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.1993 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/47] | 10.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3791408 (SAITOU K, et al); | [Y]US4175526 (PHELAN MICHAEL B [US]); | [Y]DE3542194 (THOMAS TECHNIK GES FUER MAGNET [DE]); | [A]FR2622157 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al); | [A]US4862856 (YOKOE KYOUSUKE [JP], et al); | [A]DE4003751 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 102 (M-576)(1549) 31. März 1987 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 124 (M-302)(1561) 9. Juni 1984 |