EP0612225 - OVEN WITH SMOKE GAS BYPASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2000 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 31.01.2001 [2001/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TETRA LAVAL FOOD KOPPENS B.V. Beekakker 11, Postbus 1 5760 AA Bakel / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | For all designated states TETRA LAVAL FOOD KOPPENS B.V. Beekakker 11, Postbus 1 NL-5760 AA Bakel / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYGUM, Poul Helmondsestraat 18 NL-5761 CS Bakel / NL | [1994/35] | Representative(s) | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 92923518.2 | 15.10.1992 | [1994/35] | WO1992NL00184 | Priority number, date | NL19910001727 | 16.10.1991 Original published format: NL 9101727 | NL19920000558 | 26.03.1992 Original published format: NL 9200558 | [1994/35] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9307794 | Date: | 29.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0612225 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0612225 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/12 | [1994/35] | CPC: |
A47J37/1214 (EP,US);
A47J37/1247 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/35] | Title | German: | OFEN MIT EINER UMLAUFLEITUNG FÜR VERBRENNUNGSGASE | [1994/35] | English: | OVEN WITH SMOKE GAS BYPASS | [1994/35] | French: | APPAREIL DE FRITURE POURVU D'UNE CONDUITE DE DERIVATION DES GAZ DE COMBUSTION | [1994/35] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.1993 | Translation filed | 11.04.1994 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/35] | 22.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 17.01.1996 | IE | 15.10.1996 | [2001/05] |
Former [2000/05] | GR | 17.01.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1347586 (LEON MITCHELL); | [A]GB575783 (WILLIAM WYCLIFFE SPOONER); | [A]GB760393 (NORTH WESTERN GAS BOARD); | [A]GB803210 (FOSTER WHEELER LTD); | [Y]US4228730 (SCHINDLER JAMES C, et al); | [A]EP0064407 (HEAT CONTROL INC [US]); | [A]DE3533272 (LOOS GMBH EISENWERK THEODOR [DE]); | [A]US4848317 (PRUDHOMME MALCOLM [US], et al); | [A]US4858592 (HAYEK GEORGE W [US], et al); | [Y]EP0347797 (YGNIS HOLDING AG [CH]) |