EP0724653 - A METHOD FOR POST-TREATMENT OF AN ARTICLE WITH A METALLIC SURFACE AS WELL AS A TREATMENT SOLUTION TO BE USED IN THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.02.1999 [1999/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUTTET FOR PRODUKTUDVIKLING Danmarks Tekniske Hojskole Bygning 423 2800 Lyngby / DK | [1998/07] |
Former [1996/32] | For all designated states INSTITUTTET FOR PRODUKTUDVIKLING Danmarks Tekniske Hojskole Bygning 423 DK-2800 Lyngby / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECH-NIELSEN, Gregers Pilegardsparken 29 DK-3460 Birkeröd / DK | 02 /
TANG, Peter, Torben H.P. Örumsgade 1 DK-2100 Copenhagen / DK | [1996/32] | Representative(s) | Zeuthen-Aagaard, Henrik Chas. Hude 33 H.C. Andersens Boulevard 1553 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | Zeuthen-Aagaard, Henrik Chas. Hude, 33 H.C. Andersens Boulevard 1553 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 92923714.7 | 10.11.1992 | [1996/32] | WO1992DK00328 | Priority number, date | DK19910001873 | 15.11.1991 Original published format: DK 187391 | [1996/32] | Filing language | DA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9310278 | Date: | 27.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0724653 | Date: | 07.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0724653 | Date: | 11.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C23C22/40, C25D11/00 | [1996/32] | CPC: |
C23C22/40 (EP,US);
C23C22/42 (EP,US);
C25D9/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1996/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR NACHBEHANDLUNG EINES ARTIKELS MIT METALLISCHER OBERFLÄCHE UND DAZU ZU BENUTZENDE BEHANDLUNGSFLÜSSIGKEIT | [1996/32] | English: | A METHOD FOR POST-TREATMENT OF AN ARTICLE WITH A METALLIC SURFACE AS WELL AS A TREATMENT SOLUTION TO BE USED IN THE METHOD | [1996/32] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT ULTERIEUR D'UN ARTICLE A SURFACE METALLIQUE, ET SOLUTION DE TRAITEMENT ASSOCIEE | [1996/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.1993 | Translation filed | 07.05.1994 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.05.1994 | Examination requested [1996/32] | 04.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0045017 (NIPPON KINZOKU CO LTD [JP]); | [X]JP63100194 ; | [XP]JP4083898 ; | [A]DE3443928 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 12, No. 344, C-528; & JP,A,63 100 194, (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP), 2 May 1988., & JP63100194 A 19880502 | [XP] - DIALOG INFORMATION SERVICES, File 351, World Patent Index 81-92, Dialog Accession No. 009011675, WPI Accession No. 92-139008/17, NKK CORP: "Colouring of Metallic Materials - by Cathodic Electrolysis in Bath Contg. Molybdate"; & JP,A,4 083 898, 17-03-1992, 9217, (BASIC)., & JP4083898 A 00000000 | Examination | - Dialog Information Services, File 351, World Patent Index 81-92, Dialog accession no. 009011675, WPI accession no. 92-139008/17, NKK CORP: "Colouring of metallic materials - by cathodic electrolysis in batch contg.molybdate" JP 4083898, A, 920317, 9217 (Basic) |