EP0585414 - MOTORCYCLE LOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2000 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.2000 [2000/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHERWOOD ENTERPRISES INTERNATIONAL, INC. 197 Central Avenue Rye, New York 10580 / US | [1996/11] |
Former [1994/10] | For all designated states SHERWOOD, Phifer 2120 Tremount Avenue Bronx, NY 10462 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sherwood, Phifer 2120 Tremount Avenue Bronx, NY 10462 / US | [1999/32] |
Former [1994/10] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Lucas, Brian Ronald, et al Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/10] | Lucas, Brian Ronald, et al Lucas & Co. 135 Westhall Road Warlingham Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92924098.4 | 15.08.1992 | [1994/10] | WO1992US07416 | Priority number, date | US19910746118 | 15.08.1991 Original published format: US 746118 | [1994/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9318258 | Date: | 16.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0585414 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0585414 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.09.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | E05B67/36 | [1994/10] | CPC: |
B62H5/18 (EP,US);
B62H5/003 (EP,US);
B62H5/08 (EP,US);
B62H5/14 (EP,US);
E05B35/12 (EP,US);
E05B67/003 (EP,US);
E05B67/36 (EP,US);
Y10T70/452 (EP,US);
Y10T70/5841 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/01] |
Former [1994/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE | Title | German: | MOTORRADSCHLOSS | [1994/10] | English: | MOTORCYCLE LOCK | [1994/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF ANTI-VOL POUR MOTOCYCLETTES | [1994/10] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.1993 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.1993 | Search fee paid | 03.11.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.1993 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.03.1994 | Examination requested [1994/35] | 15.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL | 14.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.10.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 03.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/30] | Request for further processing for: | 31.05.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 31.05.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.06.1999 | Decision despatched | 03.12.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 03.12.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 18.12.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.01.1994 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.1994 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.1994 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.1993 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   03.11.1993 | 11.01.1994 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.1994 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.1993 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   03.11.1993 | 02.11.1993 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   03.11.1993 | 11.01.1994 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.1994 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.1993 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   03.11.1993 | 11.01.1994 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.1994 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.1994 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.1994 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]DE9006312U (KOTLIN) [Y] 1,10,20 * page 1, line 25 - line 27 * * page 2, line 1 - line 9; figure - * [A] 2,3; | [YA]EP0086381 (VIRO INNOCENTI SPA [IT]) [Y] 1,10,20 * page 5, line 10 - page 10, line 19; figure - * [A] 2-4; | [A]DE3623231 (SOOS KALMAN VON DIPL PHYS DR I [DE]) [A] 1,4,5,11,13 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 9 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 37; figure - *; | [A]FR528285 (CHARLES TREBOSCEN [FR]) [A] 1,11 * page 1, line 1 - line 17 * * page 1, line 28 - page 2, line 3; figure - *; | [A]GB2045332 (ELLIS A E H) [A] 17 * ABSTRACT; page 1, line 3 - line 7 * * page 1, line 69 - page 2, line 69; figures 1-3 *; | [EA]DE9210554U (SHIEH) [E] 1,10,20 * page 2, line 6 - page 3, line 2 * * page 3, line 29 - page 6, line 17; figure - * [A] 2,3 | International search | [X]US4033160 (MIMA JAMES J); | [X]US2104981 (FALK BERNARD S); | [Y]US4073165 (GRUNDSTROM ROBERT RONNIE, et al); | [Y]US2557028 (DEUTSCH LEO E); | [A]US2656704 (EMANUEL MANCUSO); | [AP]US5133201 (LAMOTT DARRYL L [US], et al); | [A]US4294090 (METZGER ROMAIN); | [A]GB1218128 (VIRO INNOCENTI SPA [IT]); | [A]DE2810756 (VIRO INNOCENTI SPA) |