EP0627932 - ANTIBODY CONSTRUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/50] | NOVEL ANTIBODY CONSTRUCT | ||
[2000/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states City of Hope 1500 East Duarte Road Duarte, CA 91010 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | For all designated states CITY OF HOPE 1500 East Duarte Road Duarte California 91010-0269 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Anna, M. 14919 Sutton Street Sherman Oaks, CA 91403 / US | [1994/50] | Representative(s) | Hall, Marina, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | Dowden, Marina, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1995/01] | Marchant, James Ian Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1994/50] | Sheard, Andrew Gregory Kilburn & Strode 30, John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 92924181.8 | 04.11.1992 | [1994/50] | WO1992US09347 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9409817 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0627932 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0627932 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.05.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/13, C07K16/46, C07K16/30, C12N1/21 | [2000/13] | CPC: |
C07K16/468 (EP,US);
C07K16/00 (EP,US);
C07K16/3007 (EP,US);
Y10S530/866 (EP,US);
Y10S530/867 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/50] | A61K39/00, C12P21/06, C12N5/00, C12N1/00, C12N15/00, C07K3/00, C07K13/00, C07K15/00, C07K17/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/50] | Title | German: | ANTIKÖRPERKONSTRUKTE | [2000/15] | English: | ANTIBODY CONSTRUCT | [2000/15] | French: | STRUCTURE D'ANTICORPS | [2000/15] |
Former [1994/50] | NEUARTIGE ANTIKÖRPERKONSTRUKTE | ||
Former [1994/50] | NOVEL ANTIBODY CONSTRUCT | ||
Former [1994/50] | NOUVELLE STRUCTURE D'ANTICORPS | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.1994 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.1994 | Search fee paid | 01.08.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/50] | 08.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0506124 (TANOX BIOSYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 8,12 * page 10 *; | [A] - COLCHER D ET AL, "IN VIVO TUMOR TARGETING OF A RECOMBINANT SINGLE-CHAIN ANTIGEN-BINDING PROTEIN", JOURNAL OF THE NATIONAL CANCER INSTITUTE, (19900718), vol. 82, no. 14, pages 1191 - 1197, XP000574245 [A] 1-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jnci/82.14.1191 | [A] - P.PACK AND A.PLÜCKTHUN, "Miniantibodies: Use of amphipatic helices to produce functional, flexibly linked dimeric Fv fragments with high avidity in Escherichia coli", BIOCHEMISTRY, EASTON, PA US, (19920218), vol. 31, no. 6, pages 1579 - 1584, XP002026334 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00121a001 | [A] - A.J.CUMBER ET AL., "Comparative stabilities in vitro and in vivo of a recombinant mouse antibody FvCys fragment and a bisFvCys conjugate", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, BALTIMORE US, (19920701), vol. 149, no. 1, pages 120 - 126, XP002026335 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [T] - S-Z HU ET AL., "Minibody: A novel engineered anti-carcinoembryonic antigen antibody fragment ( single-chain Fv-CH3) which exhibits rapid, high-level targeting of xenografts", CANCER RESEARCH, MD US, (19960701), vol. 56, no. 13, pages 3055 - 3061, XP002026337 [T] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [XY] - Cancer Research, Volume 51, issued 01 December 1991, MILENIC et al.: "Construction, Binding Properties, Metabolism, and Tumor Targeting of a Single-Chain Fv Derived from the Pancarcinoma Monoclonal Antibody CC49", pages 6363-6371, see entire document. | [Y] - Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, Volume 81, issued November 1984, MORRISON et al.: "Chimeric Human Antibody Molecules: Mouse Antigen-Binding Domains with Human Constant Region Domains", pages 6851-6855, see entire document. | [Y] - Science, Volume 242, issued 21 October 1988, BIRD et al.: "Single-Chain Antigen-Binding Proteins", pages 423-426, see entire document. | [Y] - Human Antibodies and Hybridomas, Volume 1, No. 1, issued 1990, GILLIES et al.: "Antigen Binding and Biological Activities of Engineered Mutant Chimeric Antibodies with Human Tumor Specificities", pages 47-54, see entire document. | [Y] - Cancer Research, Vol. 50, issued 01 April 1990, NEUMAIER et al.: "Cloning of the Genes for T84,66, and Antibody... Hampster Ovary Cells", pages 2128-2134, entire document. |