EP0565709 - AQUEOUS INK JET INKS CONTAINING POLYOL/ALKYLENE OXIDE CONDENSATES AS COSOLVENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.11.1997 [1997/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATRICK, Howard 5D Twinlights Terrace Highlands, NJ 07732 / US | 02 /
SHEPARD, Michele, Elise 1351 Felicita Lane Escondido, CA 92029 / US | 03 /
YOU, Young, Soo 486 Casita Way Highway Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | [1993/42] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1993/42] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 92924371.5 | 05.11.1992 | [1993/42] | WO1992US09634 | Priority number, date | US19910788141 | 05.11.1991 Original published format: US 788141 | [1993/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9309194 | Date: | 13.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0565709 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0565709 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
C09D11/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/42] | Title | German: | Wäsrige inkjet Tinten mit Plyol/Alkenoxid-Kondensaten als Cosolvent | [1993/42] | English: | AQUEOUS INK JET INKS CONTAINING POLYOL/ALKYLENE OXIDE CONDENSATES AS COSOLVENTS | [1993/42] | French: | ENCRES AQUEUSES DESTINEES AUX IMPRIMANTES A JET D'ENCRE ET CONTENANT DES CONDENSATS DE POLYOL/OXYDE D'ALKYLENE COMME CO-SOLVANTS | [1993/42] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.1993 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/03] | 11.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 14.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.02.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4184881 (BRADLEY EDWARD T [US]); | [A]GB2199041 (CANON KK) |