EP0615456 - DISPOSABLE INJECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.1996 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.01.1997 [1997/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmaplan GmbH Im Atzelnest 5 61352 Bad Homburg v.d.H. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/14] | For all designated states Pharmaplan GmbH Im Atzelnest 5 D-61352 Bad Homburg v.d.H. / DE | ||
Former [1994/38] | For all designated states MED-PLASTIC AG Grienbachstrasse 17 CH-6301 Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYER, Philippe Usteristra e 14 CH-8021 Zürich / CH | 02 /
PICKHARD, Ewald Pfefferreith 5 A-3683 Yspertal / AT | 03 /
VEHRENKAMP, Reiner Berliner Stra e 26 D-6380 Bad Homburg / DE | [1994/38] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/14] | Dr. Fuchs, Dr. Luderschmidt Dr. Mehler, Dipl.-Ing Weiss Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 D-65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1994/38] | Secklehner, Günter, Dr. Rechtsanwalt, Pyhrnstrasse 1 A-8940 Liezen / AT | Application number, filing date | 92924478.8 | 07.12.1992 | [1994/38] | WO1992AT00161 | Priority number, date | CH19910003587 | 05.12.1991 Original published format: CH 358791 | [1994/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9310841 | Date: | 10.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0615456 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/50 | [1994/38] | CPC: |
A61M5/5013 (EP);
A61M2005/3128 (EP);
A61M2005/5053 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI [1994/38] | Title | German: | INJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINMALVERWENDUNG | [1994/38] | English: | DISPOSABLE INJECTION DEVICE | [1994/38] | French: | SERINGUE A USAGE UNIQUE | [1994/38] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.1994 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/38] | 05.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/05] | 27.08.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]WO9204064 ; | [X]FR2632190 ; | [A]US5000735 |