EP0574559 - PROCESS FOR PREVENTING A PROFILED JOINTING STRIP FROM MOVING IN RELATION TO A TUNNEL STRUCTURAL COMPONENT AND PROFILED JOINTING STRIP PRODUCED THEREBY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DÄTWYLER AG Schweizerische Kabel- Gummi- und Kunststoffwerke Gotthardstrasse 31 CH-6460 Altdorf-Uri / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/51] | For all designated states DÄTWYLER AG Schweizerische Kabel- Gummi- und Kunststoffwerke Gotthardstrasse 31 CH-6460 Altdorf-Uri / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERWEGH, Norbert Breitacherli 16 CH-6467 Schattdorf / CH | 02 /
DAHM, Jürgen Rüttistrasse 8 CH-6467 Schattdorf / CH | [1993/51] | Representative(s) | Siebert, Rolf PATENTANWALTSBUREAU R.A. MASPOLI Witikon - Zentrum Postfach 191 8053 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1993/51] | Siebert, Rolf, Dipl.-Masch.Ing.ETH p.A. PATENTANWALTSBUREAU R.A. MASPOLI Postfach 191 CH-8053 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 92924534.8 | 21.12.1992 | [1993/51] | WO1992CH00246 | Priority number, date | CH19920000009 | 06.01.1992 Original published format: CH 992 | [1993/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9314297 | Date: | 22.07.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0574559 | Date: | 22.12.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0574559 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | E21D11/38 | [1993/51] | CPC: |
E21D11/385 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, LI [1993/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERHINDERUNG DER VERSCHIEBUNG EINER DICHTUNGSPROFILLEISTE RELATIV ZU EINEM TUNNELBAUELEMENT UND NACH DIESEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTE DICHTUNGSPROFILLEISTE | [1993/51] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREVENTING A PROFILED JOINTING STRIP FROM MOVING IN RELATION TO A TUNNEL STRUCTURAL COMPONENT AND PROFILED JOINTING STRIP PRODUCED THEREBY | [1993/51] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREVENTION DU DEPLACEMENT D'UNE MOULURE PROFILEE D'ETANCHEITE PAR RAPPORT A UN ELEMENT DE TUNNEL ET MOULURE PROFILEE D'ETANCHEITE PRODUITE SELON CE PROCEDE | [1993/51] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.1993 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/11] | 13.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 14.05.1997 | [2002/25] | Cited in | International search | [Y]CH444899 (GROTE JUPP DIPL ING [DE]); | [A]DE7229665U ; | [A]FR2620769 (PHOENIX AG [DE]); | [A]EP0414137 (PHOENIX AG [DE]); | [Y]WO9107571 (DAETWYLER AG [CH]) |