EP0570559 - HIGHLY BONDING, WATER-IMPERMEABLE AND HYDROLYSIS-RESISTANT BINDING LAYER FOR METAL, CERAMIC, GLASS, POLYMER-PLASTIC COMPOSITE MATERIALS, AND DISPERSION FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.1997 [1997/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HERAEUS KULZER GMBH Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/47] | For all designated states HERAEUS KULZER GMBH Heraeusstrasse 12-14 D-63450 Hanau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GÖBEL, Roland Heimstättenstrasse 12 D-6900 Jena / DE | [1993/47] | Representative(s) | Kühn, Hans-Christian Heraeus Holding GmbH Stabsstelle Schutzrechte Heraeusstrasse 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/20] | Kühn, Hans-Christian Heraeus Holding GmbH, Stabsstelle Schutzrechte, Heraeusstrasse 12-14 D-63450 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [1993/47] | Kühn, Hans-Christian Heraeus Kulzer GmbH, Postfach 13 20 D-61381 Friedrichsdorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 92924677.5 | 05.12.1992 | [1993/47] | WO1992EP02820 | Priority number, date | DE19914140504 | 09.12.1991 Original published format: DE 4140504 | DE19924228530 | 27.08.1992 Original published format: DE 4228530 | [1993/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9311732 | Date: | 24.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0570559 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0570559 | Date: | 10.04.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/00, C09J4/06 | [1993/47] | CPC: |
C09J4/06 (EP,US);
A61K6/76 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/30, C08L33/08 (US,EP);
A61K6/30, C08L33/10 (EP,US);
C09J4/06, C08F283/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL [1993/47] | Title | German: | HAFTFESTE, WASSERUNDURCHLÄSSIGE UND HYDROLYSEBESTÄNDIGE VERBUNDSCHICHT FÜR METALL-, KERAMIK-, GLAS-, POLYMER-KUNSTSTOFF-VERBUNDE UND DISPERSION ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [1993/47] | English: | HIGHLY BONDING, WATER-IMPERMEABLE AND HYDROLYSIS-RESISTANT BINDING LAYER FOR METAL, CERAMIC, GLASS, POLYMER-PLASTIC COMPOSITE MATERIALS, AND DISPERSION FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [1993/47] | French: | COUCHE DE LIAISON RESISTANTE A L'HYDROLYSE, IMPERMEABLE A L'EAU ET ASSURANT UNE FIXATION SOLIDE POUR MATERIAUX COMPOSITES PLASTIQUE-METAL, PLASTIQUE-CERAMIQUE, PLASTIQUE-VERRE, PLASTIQUE-POLYMERE, ET DISPERSION UTILE POUR PREPARER CELLE-CI | [1993/47] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.1993 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/47] | 18.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2227309 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [A]EP0223067 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) |