EP0624161 - 2'-DESOXY-ISOGUANOSINES, ISOSTER ANALOGUES AND ISOGUANOSINE DERIVATES AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/11] | For all designated states Roche Diagnostics GmbH 68298 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1999/08] | For all designated states BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH 68298 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1994/46] | For all designated states BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH D-68298 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEELA, Frank Gutenbergstrasse 44 D-4500 Osnabrück / DE | 02 /
KASIMIERCZUK, Zigmunt ul. Wasilkowskiego 12 m. 17 02-776 Warszawa / PL | 03 /
MÜHLEGGER, Klaus Römerstrasse 7 D-8121 Polling / DE | 04 /
VON DER ELTZ, Herbert In der Au 21 D-8120 Weilheim / DE | [1994/46] | Representative(s) | Fouquet, Herbert, et al Roche Diagnostics GmbH, Patentabteilung, Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/46] | Fouquet, Herbert, Dr., et al c/o Boehringer Mannheim GmbH, Patentabteilung, Sandhoferstrasse 116 D-68298 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 92924697.3 | 09.12.1992 | [1994/46] | WO1992EP02843 | Priority number, date | DE19914140463 | 09.12.1991 Original published format: DE 4140463 | [1994/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9312130 | Date: | 24.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0624161 | Date: | 17.11.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0624161 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/00, C07H19/04, C12Q1/68 | [1994/46] | CPC: |
C07H21/00 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
C07H19/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/46] | Title | German: | 2'-DESOXY-ISOGUANOSINE, ISOSTERE ANALOGE UND ISOGUANOSINDERIVATE SOWIE DEREN ANWENDUNG | [1994/46] | English: | 2'-DESOXY-ISOGUANOSINES, ISOSTER ANALOGUES AND ISOGUANOSINE DERIVATES AND THEIR USE | [1994/46] | French: | 2'-DESOXY-ISOGUANOSINES, ANALOGUES ISOSTERES ET DERIVES D'ISOGUANOSINE, AINSI QUE LEUR UTILISATION | [1994/46] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.1994 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/46] | 06.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 24.02.1999 | GR | 24.02.1999 | IT | 24.02.1999 | NL | 24.02.1999 | SE | 24.02.1999 | DK | 24.05.1999 | PT | 24.05.1999 | IE | 19.10.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/45] | ES | 24.02.1999 | |
GR | 24.02.1999 | ||
NL | 24.02.1999 | ||
SE | 24.02.1999 | ||
DK | 24.05.1999 | ||
PT | 24.05.1999 | ||
IE | 19.10.1999 | ||
Former [2003/07] | ES | 24.02.1999 | |
GR | 24.02.1999 | ||
NL | 24.02.1999 | ||
SE | 24.02.1999 | ||
PT | 24.05.1999 | ||
IE | 19.10.1999 | ||
Former [2002/25] | ES | 24.02.1999 | |
GR | 24.02.1999 | ||
SE | 24.02.1999 | ||
PT | 24.05.1999 | ||
IE | 19.10.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | GR | 24.02.1999 | |
SE | 24.02.1999 | ||
PT | 24.05.1999 | ||
IE | 19.10.1999 | ||
Former [2002/10] | GR | 24.02.1999 | |
PT | 24.05.1999 | ||
IE | 19.10.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | GR | 24.02.1999 | |
IE | 24.02.1999 | ||
PT | 24.05.1999 | ||
Former [2000/27] | IE | 24.02.1999 | |
PT | 24.05.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | PT | 24.05.1999 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0219838 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP0269445 (CETUS CORP [US], et al); | [X]EP0286028 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]); | [X]WO9003370 (MICROPROBE CORP [US]); | [X]WO9006312 (INST MOLEKULARBIOLOGIE UND ANA [DE]) | [X] - NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH. Bd. 11, Nr. 3, 11. Februar 1983, ARLINGTON, VIRGINIA US Seiten 871 - 882 H.B.COTTAM ET AL. 'A Convenient Synthesis of 6-Amino-1-B-D-ribofuranosylpyrazolo(3,4 -d)pyrimidin-4-one and Related 4,6-Disubstituted Pyrazolopyrimidine Nucleosides.' | [XP] - HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA. Bd. 74, Nr. 8, 11. Dezember 1991, BASEL CH Seiten 1742 - 1748 Z.KAZIMIERCZUK ET AL. '168. 2'-Deoxyguanosine and Base-Modified Analogues: Chemical and Photochemical Synthesis.' |