Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH06506002 | Global Dossier | 07.07.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI913448 | 23.12.1991 | EP9202903 | 12.12.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU657591B | Global Dossier | 16.03.1995 | B2 | AU3087192 | 28.07.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI913448 | 23.12.1991 | EP9202903 | 12.12.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BG98050 | 29.04.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI913448 | 23.12.1991 | EP9202903 | 12.12.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9205652 | 03.05.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI913448 | 23.12.1991 | EP9202903 | 12.12.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI933685 | 20.08.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI913448 | 23.12.1991 | EP9202903 | 12.12.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO932982L | 28.09.1993 | L | NO932982D0 | 20.08.1993 | D0 | Priority number | Date | ITMI913448 | 23.12.1991 | EP9202903 | 12.12.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2079489 | 20.05.1997 | C1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI913448 | 23.12.1991 | EP9202903 | 12.12.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9313056 | Global Dossier | 08.07.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI913448 | 23.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0575572 | Global Dossier | 29.12.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI913448 | 23.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2104372 | 24.06.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI913448 | 23.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1079474 | 15.12.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI913448 | 23.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ379692 | 15.09.1993 | A3 | Priority number | Date | ITMI913448 | 23.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EE9400006 | 15.12.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI913448 | 23.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP921454 | 28.02.1995 | A2 | Priority number | Date | ITMI913448 | 23.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUT69287 | 28.09.1995 | A | HU9302389D0 | 29.11.1993 | D0 | Priority number | Date | ITMI913448 | 23.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1252708 | 26.06.1995 | B | ITMI913448 | 23.06.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI913448 | 23.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | LV10426 | 20.08.1995 | B | LV10426 | 20.02.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI913448 | 23.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA22749 | 01.07.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI913448 | 23.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX9207543 | 01.08.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI913448 | 23.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ245547 | 21.12.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI913448 | 23.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL169086B | 31.05.1996 | B1 | PL297118 | 06.09.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI913448 | 23.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT101156 | 30.06.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI913448 | 23.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI9200409 | 30.09.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI913448 | 23.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK379692 | 12.04.1995 | A3 | Priority number | Date | ITMI913448 | 23.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TNSN92117 | 08.06.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI913448 | 23.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | YU110892 | 08.01.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI913448 | 23.12.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA9210004 | 13.12.1993 | B | Priority number | Date | ITMI913448 | 23.12.1991 |