EP0669884 - ASYMMETRIC BRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.1998 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.07.1998 [1998/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FINNYARDS OY P.O. Box 139 26101 Rauma / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1995/36] | For all designated states FINNYARDS OY P.O. Box 139 FIN-26101 Rauma / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGELSTAM, Lennart Tegelstensv. 19 FIN-02320 Esbo / FI | 02 /
HARJULA, Arjo Keskiyöntie 21 G FIN-02210 Espoo / FI | 03 /
ERONEN, Harri Frälsintie 9 as 6 FIN-21200 Raisio / FI | [1995/36] | Representative(s) | Gallafent, Richard John Gallafents Ltd The Old Vicarage Stanbridge, Bedfordshire LU7 9HX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/36] | Gallafent, Richard John GALLAFENT & CO. 8 Staple Inn London WCIV 7QH / GB | Application number, filing date | 92924738.5 | 30.11.1992 | [1995/36] | WO1992FI00327 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9412383 | Date: | 09.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0669884 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0669884 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 09.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B63B15/00 | [1995/36] | CPC: |
B63B15/00 (EP,US);
B63B29/00 (EP,US);
B63B49/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL, PT, SE [1995/36] | Title | German: | ASYMMETRISCHE BRÜCKE | [1995/36] | English: | ASYMMETRIC BRIDGE | [1995/36] | French: | PONT ASYMETRIQUE | [1995/36] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 20.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/36] | 13.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3986472 (POPPINGA UBBE, et al) |