EP0570598 - WINDOW MOLDING FOR MOTOR VEHICLE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.1996 [1996/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKAI KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Nagane-cho 4-chome Ohbu-shi Aichi 474 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/47] | For all designated states TOKAI KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Nagane-cho 4-chome Ohbu-shi, Aichi 474 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YADA, Yukihiko 8-6, Aza-Komori Narumi-cho Midori-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 458 / JP | 02 /
AOYAMA, Yoshihiro 25-1, Inowari Arao-cho Tokai-shi Aichi 476 / JP | [1993/47] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/47] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 D-81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92924899.5 | 10.12.1992 | [1993/47] | WO1992JP01610 | Priority number, date | JP19910349994 | 10.12.1991 Original published format: JP 34999491 | [1993/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9311956 | Date: | 24.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0570598 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.06.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60J1/02, B29C47/00, B29C47/12, B60J1/20 | [1994/20] | CPC: |
B60J1/2002 (EP,US);
B29C48/12 (EP,US);
B29C48/302 (EP,US);
B60J10/18 (EP);
B60J10/21 (EP);
B60J10/22 (EP);
B60J10/25 (EP);
B60J10/70 (EP);
B29C48/001 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1993/47] | B60J1/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, LI, NL, SE [1993/47] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGFENSTERFORMLEISTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [1993/47] | English: | WINDOW MOLDING FOR MOTOR VEHICLE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SAME | [1993/47] | French: | MOULURE DE FENETRE POUR VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1993/47] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.1993 | Translation filed | 07.09.1993 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.1993 | Search fee paid | 07.09.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/47] | 02.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/30] | 29.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS59137213 ; | [E]WO9221526 (TOKAI KOGYO CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-4 * figures 13,14 *; | EP0541824 [ ] (TOKAI KOGYO CO LTD [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841204), vol. 8, no. 263, Database accession no. (M - 342), & JP59137213 A 19840807 (NISSAN JIDOSHA K.K.) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPS6430727 (EE G II S SPA); | [X]JPH01269612 (HASHIMOTO FORMING KOGYO CO); | [X]JPH03128721 (TOKAI KOGYO CO LTD); | [X]JPH03143729 (TOKAI KOGYO CO LTD) |