EP0611494 - RED LIGHT SURFACE EMITTING SEMICONDUCTOR LASER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/34] | VISIBLE LIGHT SURFACE EMITTING SEMICONDUCTOR LASER | ||
[1998/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cielo Communications, Inc. 325 Interlocken Parkway, Building A Broomfield, Colorado 80021 / US | [2000/14] |
Former [1994/34] | For all designated states BANDGAP TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 325 Interlocken Parkway Broomfield, CO 80021 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRYAN, Robert, P. 1730 Bluff Street Boulder, CO 80304 / US | 02 /
OLBRIGHT, Gregory, R. 290 Hawthorne Boulder, CO 80304 / US | 03 /
LOTT, James, A. 9900 Spain, N.E. Apt. E-2026 Albuquerque, NM 87111 / US | 04 /
SCHNEIDER, Richard, P. 1441 Monte Lango, N.E. Albuquerque, NM 87112 / US | 05 /
JEWELL, Jack, L. 1895 Alpine Unit C-13 Boulder, CO 80304 / US | [1994/34] | Representative(s) | Klunker, Hans-Friedrich, et al Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/52] | Klunker, Hans-Friedrich, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/34] | MacDougall, Donald Carmichael Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 92925093.4 | 06.11.1992 | [1994/34] | WO1992US09535 | Priority number, date | US19910790964 | 07.11.1991 Original published format: US 790964 | [1994/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9309582 | Date: | 13.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0611494 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0611494 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.05.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/32, H01S5/10 | [2000/18] | CPC: |
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
H01S5/18308 (EP,US);
H01S2302/00 (EP,US);
H01S5/041 (EP,US);
H01S5/18341 (EP,US);
H01S5/18358 (EP,US);
H01S5/18369 (EP,US);
H01S5/18377 (EP,US);
H01S5/2063 (EP,US);
H01S5/3215 (EP,US);
H01S5/32308 (EP,US);
H01S5/32325 (EP,US);
H01S5/32341 (EP,US);
H01S5/34326 (EP,US);
H01S5/34333 (EP,US);
H01S5/347 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1994/38] | H01S3/19, H01S3/085 | ||
Former IPC [1994/34] | H01S3/19 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1994/34] | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENEMITTIERENDER LASER FÜR ROTES LICHT | [1998/37] | English: | RED LIGHT SURFACE EMITTING SEMICONDUCTOR LASER | [1998/37] | French: | LASER SEMICONDUCTEUR EMETTANT EN SURFACE DE LA LUMIERE ROUGE | [1998/37] |
Former [1994/34] | OBERFLÄCHENEMITTIERENDER LASER FÜR SICHTBARES LICHT | ||
Former [1994/34] | VISIBLE LIGHT SURFACE EMITTING SEMICONDUCTOR LASER | ||
Former [1994/34] | LASER SEMICONDUCTEUR EMETTANT EN SURFACE DE LA LUMIERE VISIBLE | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.1994 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.1994 | Search fee paid | 25.05.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 25.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/34] | 23.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.03.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.01.2001 | BE | 24.01.2001 | ES | 24.01.2001 | GR | 24.01.2001 | NL | 24.01.2001 | DK | 24.04.2001 | [2004/07] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 24.01.2001 | |
BE | 24.01.2001 | ||
ES | 24.01.2001 | ||
NL | 24.01.2001 | ||
DK | 24.04.2001 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 24.01.2001 | |
BE | 24.01.2001 | ||
ES | 24.01.2001 | ||
NL | 24.01.2001 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 24.01.2001 | |
BE | 24.01.2001 | ||
ES | 24.01.2001 | ||
Former [2002/10] | AT | 24.01.2001 | |
BE | 24.01.2001 | ||
Former [2002/03] | BE | 24.01.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0207699 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3 * figure 5; claim 7 *; | [DA] - J.L. JEWELL ET AL, "Vertical cavity surface emitting lasers:Design, growth, fabrication, characterization", IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS., NEW YORK US, (199106), vol. 27, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1109/3.89950, pages 1332 - 1346, XP000229828 [DA] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/3.89950 | [A] - C. LEI ET AL, "InGaAs-GaAs quantum well vertical cavity surface emitting laser using MBE", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS., NEW YORK US, (19910318), vol. 58, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1063/1.104390, pages 1122 - 1124, XP000209765 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.104390 | [A] - M.A. KAHN ET AL, "Vertical cavity room temperature stimulated emission from photopumped GaAn films", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS., NEW YORK US, (19910408), vol. 58, no. 14, doi:doi:10.1063/1.105163, pages 1515 - 1517, XP000209750 [A] 1,4,6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.105163 | [A] - M. A. KAHN ET AL, "Reflective filters based on single crystal GaN/AlGaN multilayers", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS., NEW YORK US, (19910916), vol. 59, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1063/1.105284, pages 1449 - 1451, XP000232881 [A] 1,4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.105284 | [PX] - R.P SCHNEIDER ET AL, "Visible (657 nm) InGaP/InAlGaP strained quantum well vertical cavity surface emitting laser", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS., NEW YORK US, (19920430), vol. 60, no. 15, doi:doi:10.1063/1.107178, pages 1830 - 1832, XP000273988 [PX] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.107178 | International search | [Y]US4949350 (JEWELL JACK L [US], et al); | [YP]US5115441 (KOPF ROSE F [US], et al); | [XP]US5146465 (KHAN MUHAMMAD A [US], et al) | by applicant | US4949350 | - J. JEWELL ET AL., "Vertical Cavity Lasers for Optical Interconnects", SPIE, (1990), vol. 1389, pages 401 - 407 | - J. JEWELL ET AL., "Vertical-Cavity Surface-Emitting Lasers: Design, Growth Fabrication, Characterization", IEEE JOURNAL OF OUANTUM ELECTRONICS, (199106), vol. 27, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1109/3.89950, pages 1332 - 1346, XP000229828 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/3.89950 | - H.-J. YOO ET AL., "Low Series Resistance Vertical-Cavity Front-Surface-Emitting Laser Diode", APPL. PHVS. LETT., (19900514), vol. 56, no. 20, doi:doi:10.1063/1.103029, pages 1942 - 1945, XP000149915 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.103029 | - J. JEWELL ET AL., "Vertical Cavity Lasers for Optical Interconnects", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ADVANCES IN INTERCONNECTION AND PACKAQING, (1990), vol. 1389, pages 401 - 407 | - Y.H. LEE ET AL., "Top-Surface-Emitting GaAs Four-Quantum-Well Lasers Emitting at 0.85", ELECTRON LETT., (1990), vol. 26, pages 1308 - 1310 |