28.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] |
15.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] |
19.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
03.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] |
20.04.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2001 [2001/23] |
19.05.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2000 [2000/27] |
03.09.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
25.06.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.1999 [1999/32] |
21.05.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.07.1999 [1999/27] |
26.02.1999 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.04.1999 [1999/15] |
13.11.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.12.1998 [1998/53] |
11.09.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.10.1998 [1998/44] |
06.03.1998 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.04.1998 [1998/17] |
09.02.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.02.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.10.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
18.10.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.10.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
16.10.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
16.10.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.10.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
03.06.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
01.03.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
08.02.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.01.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
20.12.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.08.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
20.04.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
17.04.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.02.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.11.1995 |
First examination report |
|
28.04.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.06.1994 [1994/24] |
14.01.1994 |
Publication of search report |
published on 09.03.1994 [1994/10] |
16.12.1993 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.02.1994 [1994/05] |
27.05.1993 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.07.1993 [1993/28] |