Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3035840B | Global Dossier | 24.04.2000 | B2 | JPH0626956 | 04.02.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | FI920083 | 09.01.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0551115 | Global Dossier | 22.04.1998 | B1 | EP0551115 | 09.03.1994 | A3 | EP0551115 | 14.07.1993 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FI920083 | 09.01.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE165444T | 15.05.1998 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FI920083 | 09.01.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69318044T | 01.10.1998 | T2 | DE69318044D1 | 28.05.1998 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FI920083 | 09.01.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI89537C | 11.10.1993 | C | FI89537B | 30.06.1993 | B | Priority number | Date | FI920083 | 09.01.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5359904 | 01.11.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | FI920083 | 09.01.1992 |