EP0557692 - Apparatus for controlling the steering angle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.09.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 02.11.1995 [1995/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cao, Chi-Thuan, Dr.-Ing. Tubizer Strasse 35 W-7015 Korntal / DE | 02 /
Schubert, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Drosselweg 25 W-7262 Althengstett / DE | [1993/35] | Application number, filing date | 93100244.8 | 09.01.1993 | [1993/35] | Priority number, date | DE19924202699 | 31.01.1992 Original published format: DE 4202699 | [1993/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0557692 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B62D7/15, B62D6/00, // (B62D101/00, 111:00) | [1993/35] | CPC: |
G05D1/0891 (EP);
B62D6/00 (EP);
B62D7/159 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1993/35] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Steuerung des Lenkwinkels | [1993/35] | English: | Apparatus for controlling the steering angle | [1993/35] | French: | Dispositif de commande de l'angle de braquage | [1993/35] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 18.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/16] | 20.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/44] | 16.06.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1995 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3642049 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]); | [AD]DE3734477 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]); | [A]EP0275744 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al); | [A]EP0333108 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0379143 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) | [AD] - REGELUNGSTECHNIK Nr. 3, 1979, MÜNCHEN,DE Seiten 76 - 79 KREISSELMEIER ET AL. 'Systematische Auslegung von Reglern durch Optimierung eines vektoriellen G}tekriteriums' | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1990 AMERICAN CONTROL CONFERENCE 23. Mai 1990, SAN DIEGO,US Seiten 801 - 808 ITO ET AL. 'Stability Analysis of Automatic Lateral Motion Controlled Vehicle with Four Wheel Steering system' |