EP0553643 - Method for treating combustion exhaust gas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1999 [1999/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Kansai Electric Power Co., Inc. 3-22, Nakanoshima-3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530 / JP | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/31] | For all designated states THE KANSAI ELECTRIC POWER CO., INC. 3-22, Nakanoshima-3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530 / JP | ||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujii, Masumi, c/o The Kansai Electric Power Co., Inc., 3-22, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Suda, Taiichiro, c/o The Kansai Electric Power Co., Inc., 3-22, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Hotta, Yoshitsugu, c/o The Kansai Electric Power Co., Inc., 3-22, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 04 /
Kobayashi, Kenji, c/o The Kansai Electric Power Co., Inc., 3-22, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 05 /
Yoshida, Kunihiko, c/o The Kansai Electric Power Co., Inc., 11-20, Nakoji 3-chome Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 06 /
Shimojo, Shigeru, c/o The Kansai Electric Power Co., Inc., 11-20, Nakoji 3-chome Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 07 /
Kitamura, Koichi, c/o The Kansai Electric Power Co., Inc., 3-22, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 08 /
Kawasaki, Masami, c/o The Kansai Electric Power Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | 09 /
Karasaki, Mutsunori, c/o Mitsubishi Jukogyo K. K. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 10 /
Iijima, Masaki, c/o Mitsubishi Jukogyo K. K. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | 11 /
Seto, Touru, Mitsubishi Jukogyo K. K. 6-22, Kan-on-Shinmachi 4-chome, Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 12 /
Mitsuoka, Shigeaki, Mitsubishi Jukogyo K. K. 6-22, Kan-on-Shinmachi 4-chome, Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | [1998/37] |
Former [1993/31] | 01 /
Fujii, Masumi, c/o The Kansai Electric Power Co., Inc., 3-22, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | ||
02 /
Suda, Taiichiro, c/o The Kansai Electric Power Co., Inc., 3-22, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | |||
03 /
Hotta, Yoshitsugu, c/o The Kansai Electric Power Co., Inc., 3-22, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | |||
04 /
Kobayashi, Kenji, c/o The Kansai Electric Power Co., Inc., 3-22, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | |||
05 /
Yoshida, Kunihiko, c/o The Kansai Electric Power Co., Inc., 11-20, Nakoji 3-chome Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
06 /
Shimojo, Shigeru, c/o The Kansai Electric Power Co., Inc., 11-20, Nakoji 3-chome Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
07 /
Kitamura, Koichi, c/o The Kansai Electric Power Co., Inc., 3-22, Nakanoshima 3-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | |||
08 /
Kawasaki, Masami, c/o Mitsubishi Jukogyo K. K. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
09 /
Karasaki, Nutsunori, c/o Mitsubishi Jukogyo K. K. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
10 /
Iijima, Masaki, c/o Mitsubishi Jukogyo K. K. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
11 /
Sezo, Touru, Mitsubishi Jukogyo K. K. 6-22, Kan-on-Shinmachi 4-chome, Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | |||
12 /
Mitsuoka, Shigeaki, Mitsubishi Jukogyo K. K. 6-22, Kan-on-Shinmachi 4-chome, Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Behrens, Dieter Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/31] | Behrens, Dieter, Dr.-Ing. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93100395.8 | 13.01.1993 | [1993/31] | Priority number, date | JP19920006466 | 17.01.1992 Original published format: JP 646692 | JP19920006467 | 17.01.1992 Original published format: JP 646792 | JP19920045246 | 03.03.1992 Original published format: JP 4524692 | [1993/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0553643 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0553643 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0553643 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/14, B01D53/58, B01D53/62 | [1998/20] | CPC: |
B01D53/1406 (EP,US);
B01D53/1418 (EP,US);
Y02C20/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/40] | B01D53/14, B01D53/34 | ||
Former IPC [1993/31] | B01D53/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1993/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung von Verbrennungsabgasen | [1993/31] | English: | Method for treating combustion exhaust gas | [1993/31] | French: | Procédé pour le traitement de gaz de combustion | [1993/31] | Examination procedure | 06.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/22] | 20.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XPL]EP0502596 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP], et al); | [X]EP0359991 (BASF AG [DE]); | [A]EP0225817 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]); | [A]US4002565 (FARRELL THOMAS R, et al); | [A]EP0062684 (RUHRKOHLE AG [DE]) |