EP0552666 - Method of producing plastic products having hard, wear resistant surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/30] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY 1 John Deere Road Moline, Illinois 61265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Revankar, Gopal Subray 2525-31st Avenue Court Moline, Illinois 61265 / US | [1993/30] | Representative(s) | Feldmann, Bernhard, et al DEERE & COMPANY European Office, Patent Department D-68140 Mannheim / DE | [1993/30] | Application number, filing date | 93100459.2 | 14.01.1993 | [1993/30] | Priority number, date | US19920822905 | 21.01.1992 Original published format: US 822905 | [1993/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0552666 | Date: | 28.07.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B29C67/16 | [1993/30] | CPC: |
B29C31/008 (EP,US);
B29C70/64 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0087 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Kunststofferzeugnisses mit harter, verschleissfester Oberfläche | [1993/30] | English: | Method of producing plastic products having hard, wear resistant surfaces | [1993/30] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'objets plastiques comportant des surfaces dures et résistantes à l'usure | [1993/30] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 04.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/31] | 07.06.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0037536 (SCHULZ JUERGEN); | [APD]EP0470503 (DEERE & CO [US]); | [A]GB2011028 (LEUZE G) |