Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW221305B | 21.02.1994 | B | Priority number | Date | JP118793 | 07.01.1993 | JP754192 | 20.01.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH05279917 | Global Dossier | 26.10.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | JP754192 | 20.01.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0554709 | Global Dossier | 11.08.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP754192 | 20.01.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR930016578 | 26.08.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | JP754192 | 20.01.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5370929 | 06.12.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | JP754192 | 20.01.1992 |