EP0557718 - Catalyst for olefin polymerisation, process for preparing the same and its sue [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.1996 [1996/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herrmann, Hans-Friedrich, Dr. Im Steinfeld 3 W-6100 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
Bachmann, Bernd, Dr. Kreuzheck 4 W-6239 Eppstein/Ts. / DE | 03 /
Dolle, Volker, Dr. Wolfsgartenstrasse 27 W-6140 Bensheim / DE | 04 /
Spaleck, Walter, Dr. Sulzbacher Strasse 63 W-6237 Liederbach / DE | [1993/35] | Application number, filing date | 93100891.6 | 21.01.1993 | [1993/35] | Priority number, date | DE19924201850 | 24.01.1992 Original published format: DE 4201850 | [1993/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0557718 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0557718 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/602, C08F10/00 | [1993/35] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP);
C08F4/22 (KR);
C08F4/63912 (EP);
C08F4/63916 (EP);
C08F4/63922 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/6028 (EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/63912 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/35] | Title | German: | Katalysator für die Olefinpolymerisation, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und seine Verwendung | [1993/35] | English: | Catalyst for olefin polymerisation, process for preparing the same and its sue | [1993/35] | French: | Catalyseur pour polymérisation d'oléfines, procédé de sa préparation et son utilisation | [1993/35] | Examination procedure | 03.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/05] | 23.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0363029 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) |