EP0556599 - Frequency doubler and short wave laser source using the same and optical data processing apparatus using the short wave laser source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/34] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Kazuhisa 13-17-903, Senriokahigashi-5-chome Settsu-shi / JP | 02 /
Mizuuchi, Kiminori 30-5-206, Miiminamimachi Neyagawa-shi / JP | [1993/34] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/34] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7/II Aufg. D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93101129.0 | 26.01.1993 | [1993/34] | Priority number, date | JP19920011645 | 27.01.1992 Original published format: JP 1164592 | JP19920011651 | 27.01.1992 Original published format: JP 1165192 | [1993/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0556599 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0556599 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/37 | [1993/34] | CPC: |
G02F1/3775 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1993/34] | Title | German: | Frequenzverdoppler und eine ihn verwendende kurzwellige Laser-Quelle und eine diese Laser-Quelle benutzendes optisches Datenverarbeitungssystem | [1993/34] | English: | Frequency doubler and short wave laser source using the same and optical data processing apparatus using the short wave laser source | [1993/34] | French: | Doubleur de fréquence et source laser à courte longueur d'onde utilisant ce doubleur et appareil optique pour le traitement de données utilisant ce laser | [1993/34] | Examination procedure | 10.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/12] | 27.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0382462 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) | [AD] - KAZUHISA YAMAMOTO, KIMINORI MIZUUCHI, TETSUO TANIUCHI, "MILLIWATT-ORDER BLUE-LIGHT GENERATION IN A PERIODICALLY DOMAIN-INVERTED LITAO3 WAVEGUIDE.", Optics Letters, Optical Society of America, US, US, (19910801), vol. 16., no. 15., ISSN 0146-9592, pages 1156 - 1158., XP000217657 | [A] - KIMINORI MIZUUCHI, KAZUHISA YAMAMOTO, TETSUO TANIUCHI, "FABRICATION OF FIRST-ORDER PERIODICALLY DOMAIN-INVERTED STRUCTURE IN LITAO3.", Applied Physics Letters, A I P Publishing LLC, US, US, (19910923), vol. 59., no. 13., doi:10.1063/1.106275, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 1538 - 1540., XP000235515 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.106275 | [X] - INSPEC, Institution of Electrical Engineers, Hitchin, GB ,abstract no. 3786165; | [X] - OPTICS LETTERS. vol. 13, no. 7, July 1988, NEW YORK US pages 603 - 605 J.KHURGIN 'Improvement of frequency-conversion efficiency in waveguide with rotationally twinned layers' | Examination | - INSPEC, Institution of Electrical Engineers, Hitchin, GB, abstract no. 3786165; & Record of Electrical and Communication Engineering Conversazione Tohoku Univer. May 1990, pp 177-178; P.T. FUJIWARA: "A study on dielectric nonlinear optical waveguide" |