EP0558920 - Chain conveyor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DE | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Winkler und Dünnebier Süsswarenmaschinen GmbH Ringstrasse 1 56579 Rengsdorf / DE | [1998/26] |
Former [1993/36] | For all designated states WINKLER & DÜNNEBIER MASCHINENFABRIK UND EISENGIESSEREI KG Sohler Weg 65 D-56564 Neuwied / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rüegg, Hanno Schützenstrasse 19 CH-8280 Kreuzlingen / CH | 02 /
Puderbach, Gerhard In der Allee 15 W-5450 Neuwied 1 / DE | [1993/36] | Representative(s) | Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 30 02 08 51412 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | Patentanwälte Lippert, Stachow, Schmidt & Partner Postfach 30 02 08 51412 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 93101269.4 | 28.01.1993 | [1993/36] | Priority number, date | DE19924202897 | 01.02.1992 Original published format: DE 4202897 | [1993/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0558920 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0558920 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0558920 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A23G1/26, A23G7/00, B65G23/00, B65G21/00, B65G47/31 | [1993/45] | CPC: |
B65G21/14 (EP);
B65G47/5122 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1993/36] | A23G1/26, A23G7/00, B65G23/00, B65G21/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, GB, IT, LI, SE [1993/36] | Title | German: | Kettentransport | [1993/36] | English: | Chain conveyor | [1993/36] | French: | Transporteur à chaîne | [1993/36] | Examination procedure | 25.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/17] | 19.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 16.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.02.1998
11.05.1998
ADMISSIBLE Gebr. Bindler Maschinenfabrik GmbH & Co. KG Kölner Str. 102 - 106 51702 Bergneustadt / DE Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.02.1998
Gebr. Bindler Maschinenfabrik GmbH & Co. KG Kölner Str. 102 - 106 51702 Bergneustadt / DE Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 18 30 40009 Düsseldorf / DE | 14.05.1998 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.11.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2001 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 21.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 01.07.2002 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 14.05.1997 | IT | 14.05.1997 | SE | 14.08.1997 | GB | 28.01.1998 | CH | 31.01.1998 | LI | 31.01.1998 | DE | 01.11.2000 | [2002/13] |
Former [2000/17] | DK | 14.05.1997 | |
IT | 14.05.1997 | ||
SE | 14.08.1997 | ||
GB | 28.01.1998 | ||
CH | 31.01.1998 | ||
LI | 31.01.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | DK | 14.05.1997 | |
IT | 14.05.1997 | ||
SE | 14.08.1997 | ||
GB | 28.01.1998 | ||
Former [1999/02] | DK | 14.05.1997 | |
SE | 14.08.1997 | ||
GB | 28.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 14.05.1997 | |
SE | 14.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | SE | 14.08.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0509624 (APV CREPACO INC [US]); | [A]EP0345585 (HAENSEL OTTO GMBH [DE]); | [A]US4231470 (PARKES RALPH C) |