EP0555700 - Single-phase induction motor with starting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1998 | Refusal of application | published on 04.03.1998 [1998/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRUNDFOS A/S Poul Due Jensens Vej 7-11 DK-8850 Bjerringbro / DK | [1993/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jensen, Niels Due Pilevej 1 DK-8850 Bjerringbro / DK | 02 /
Daugbjerg, Jorgen Karmark Skovvej nr. 6 DK-8860 Ulstrup / DK | [1993/33] | Representative(s) | Vollmann, Heiko Patentanwälte Vollmann Hemmer Lindfeld Partnerschaft mbB Wallstrasse 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/33] | Vollmann, Heiko, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Wilcken & Vollmann, Musterbahn 1 D-23552 Lübeck / DE | Application number, filing date | 93101295.9 | 28.01.1993 | [1993/33] | Priority number, date | DE19924204323 | 14.02.1992 Original published format: DE 4204323 | DE19924215263 | 09.05.1992 Original published format: DE 4215263 | [1993/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0555700 | Date: | 18.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H02P1/44, H02K17/08 | [1993/33] | CPC: |
H02P1/44 (EP,US);
H02K17/04 (KR);
F04D13/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/33] | Title | German: | Einphaseninduktionsmotor mit Anlaufeinrichtung | [1993/33] | English: | Single-phase induction motor with starting device | [1993/33] | French: | Moteur monophasé à induction avec dispositif de démarrage | [1993/33] | Examination procedure | 18.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/03] | 04.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 08.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.09.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1998/10] | 10.10.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1494109 (UNELEC); | [Y]DE3440923 (GRUNDFOS AS [DK]); | [X]GB738159 (GEN ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al); | [A]DE1289912 (ACEC [BE]) |