EP0556625 - Two-step process for post-chlorinating poly(vinyl chloride) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2000 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 03.01.2001 [2001/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The B.F. GOODRICH Company 3925 Embassy Parkway Akron Ohio 44313-1799 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states THE B.F. GOODRICH COMPANY 3925 Embassy Parkway Akron Ohio 44313-1799 / US | ||
Former [1993/34] | For all designated states The B.F. Goodrich Company 3925 Embassy Parkway Akron Ohio 44313 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cinadr, Bernard Frank 8312 Whitewood Road Brecksville, Ohio 44141 / US | 02 /
Backman, Arthur Leonard 1561 Saddlebrook Lane Westlake, Ohio 44145 / US | [1993/34] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/34] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 93101493.0 | 31.01.1993 | [1993/34] | Priority number, date | US19920837180 | 18.02.1992 Original published format: US 837180 | [1993/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0556625 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0556625 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/22 | [1993/34] | CPC: |
C08F8/22 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/22, C08F14/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1993/34] | Title | German: | Zweistufenverfahren zur Nachchlorierung von Polyvinylchlorid | [1993/34] | English: | Two-step process for post-chlorinating poly(vinyl chloride) | [1993/34] | French: | Procédé en deux étapes pour la post-chlorination de chlorure de polyvinyle | [1993/34] | Examination procedure | 20.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/12] | 12.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.09.1996 | CH | 25.09.1996 | DK | 25.09.1996 | GR | 25.09.1996 | LI | 25.09.1996 | SE | 25.12.1996 | PT | 26.12.1996 | IE | 31.01.1997 | LU | 31.01.1997 | [2001/01] |
Former [2000/05] | AT | 25.09.1996 | |
CH | 25.09.1996 | ||
DK | 25.09.1996 | ||
GR | 25.09.1996 | ||
LI | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
LU | 31.01.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 25.09.1996 | |
CH | 25.09.1996 | ||
DK | 25.09.1996 | ||
LI | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 25.09.1996 | |
CH | 25.09.1996 | ||
LI | 25.09.1996 | ||
SE | 25.12.1996 | ||
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/22] | SE | 25.12.1996 | |
PT | 26.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/18] | SE | 25.12.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE801304 (BASF AG); | [A]FR1566538 ; | [A]FR2307825 (STAMICARBON [NL]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 104, no. 2, January 1986, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 6360e, P. SCHMIDT 'POST-CHLORINATION OF POLY(VINYL CHLORIDE) SUSPENSIONS' page 13 ;column 2 ; |