EP0558939 - Chamotte brick and process for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.1998 [1998/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VGT INDUSTRIEKERAMIK GmbH 37247 Grossalmerode / DE | [1997/40] |
Former [1993/36] | For all designated states VGT INDUSTRIEKERAMIK GmbH D-37247 Grossalmerode / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petschauer, Hans Ziegenberg 5 W-3432 Grossalmerode / DE | [1993/36] | Representative(s) | Rehberg, Elmar Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Postfach 31 62 37021 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/36] | Rehberg, Elmar, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Postfach 31 62 D-37021 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 93101545.7 | 02.02.1993 | [1993/36] | Priority number, date | DE19924206734 | 04.03.1992 Original published format: DE 4206734 | [1993/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0558939 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0558939 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C04B33/16, C04B33/32, C04B38/00 | [1993/36] | CPC: |
C04B33/16 (EP,US);
C04B33/32 (EP,US);
C04B38/00 (EP,US);
C04B2201/40 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B38/00, C04B33/16, C04B38/0074 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/36] | Title | German: | Schamottestein und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1993/36] | English: | Chamotte brick and process for its production | [1993/36] | French: | Chamotte et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1993/36] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/46] | 14.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0453886 (DIDIER WERKE AG [DE]) |