EP0557752 - Divided loom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.1996 [1996/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Picanol N.V. Polenlaan 3-7 8900 Ieper / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | For all designated states Picanol N.V. Polenlaan 3-7 B-8900 Ieper / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gruwez, Marc Bergstraat 1 B-9630 Zwalm / BE | [1993/35] | Representative(s) | Wilhelm & Dauster Hospitalstrasse 8 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/35] | Wilhelm & Dauster Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys Hospitalstrasse 8 D-70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 93101706.5 | 04.02.1993 | [1993/35] | Priority number, date | BE19920000197 | 27.02.1992 Original published format: BE 9200197 | [1993/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0557752 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0557752 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | D03D49/02, B23Q1/00, F16B2/14, D03J1/00 | [1993/35] | CPC: |
B23Q1/0063 (EP,US);
D03D49/02 (EP,US);
D03J1/001 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49895 (EP,US);
Y10T403/1616 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/35] | Title | German: | Geteilte Webmaschine | [1993/35] | English: | Divided loom | [1993/35] | French: | Métier à tisser divisé | [1993/35] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/03] | 30.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3615942 (UEBERREITER EKKEHARD [DE]); | [A]US4934413 (YAO MASAMI [JP]); | [A]DE3708598 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]); | [XP]DE9208800U ; | [AD]EP0451895 (PICANOL NV [BE]); | [AD]CH668608 (PICANOL NV); | [AD]US3888284 (TIERNAN STANLEY C, et al) | by applicant | CH668608 | US3888284 | EP0451895 |