Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5454615 | 03.10.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US4121893 | 31.03.1993 | DE4210475 | 31.03.1992 | US30863394 | 19.09.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH068735 | Global Dossier | 18.01.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4210475 | 31.03.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0563547 | Global Dossier | 28.05.1997 | B1 | EP0563547 | 06.10.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4210475 | 31.03.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4210475 | 07.10.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4210475 | 31.03.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59306552D1 | 03.07.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE4210475 | 31.03.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2101884T | 16.07.1997 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE4210475 | 31.03.1992 |